EP4356364 - SYSTEM AND METHOD OF FACILITATING LIVE JAM SESSION WITH SONG RECOMMENDATION ENGINE TO RECOMMEND A SONG TO BE PLAYED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.03.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states School of Rock, LLC 1 Wattles Street Canton, MA 02021 / US | [2024/17] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DRESSER, Sam Glen Ellyn, Illinois 60137 / US | 02 /
SITNICK, Leonard A. Catonsville, Maryland 21228 / US | 03 /
PRICE, Robert Lowell Sharon, Massachusetts 02067 / US | [2024/17] | Representative(s) | Kalkoff & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Martin-Schmeisser-Weg 3a-3b 44227 Dortmund / DE | [2024/17] | Application number, filing date | 22747170.3 | 20.06.2022 | [2024/17] | WO2022US34185 | Priority number, date | TW20210122397 | 18.06.2021 Original published format: TW 110122397 | US202117553423 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: US202117553423 | [2024/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022266537 | Date: | 22.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/51] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4356364 | Date: | 24.04.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G09B5/02, G09B15/00 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
G09B5/02 (EP);
G09B15/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/17] | Extension states | BA | 04.01.2024 | ME | 04.01.2024 | Validation states | KH | 04.01.2024 | MA | 04.01.2024 | MD | 04.01.2024 | TN | 04.01.2024 | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERMÖGLICHUNG EINER LIVE-JAM-SITZUNG MIT EINER LIEDEMPFEHLUNGSMASCHINE ZUR EMPFEHLUNG EINES ZU ABSPIELENDEN LIEDES | [2024/17] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD OF FACILITATING LIVE JAM SESSION WITH SONG RECOMMENDATION ENGINE TO RECOMMEND A SONG TO BE PLAYED | [2024/17] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR FACILITER UNE JAM SESSION EN DIRECT AVEC UN MOTEUR DE RECOMMANDATION DE CHANSON POUR RECOMMANDER UNE CHANSON À JOUER | [2024/17] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/17] | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 25.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008302233 (DING XIAO-YU [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0111] - paragraph [0113] *; | [XI]US2015254056 (WALKER PETER A [US], et al) [X] 21 * paragraph [0098] * * paragraph [0128] - paragraph [0129] * * paragraph [0187] * * paragraph [0230] * * paragraph [0269] * * paragraph [0288] * * paragraph [0312] * [I] 22-24; | [A]US2018341702 (SAWRUK JEREMY [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * the whole document *; | [A]US2020186575 (ROFE MICHAEL DAVID [GB], et al) [A] 21-24 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0016] * * paragraph [0042] - paragraph [0045] * * paragraph [0050] ** paragraph [0076] - paragraph [0077] *; | [Y]WO2020257535 (SCHOOL OF ROCK LLC [US]) [Y] 1-20 * paragraph [0004] * * paragraph [0037] * * paragraph [0041] * * paragraph [0048] * * paragraph [0054] * * paragraph [0055] * * paragraph [0056] - paragraph [0058] * * paragraph [0060] - paragraph [0061] * * paragraph [0062] * |