EP4373354 - DRAWER PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR MOVABLY SUPPORTING A DRAWER ON A FURNITURE BODY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Julius Blum GmbH Industriestrasse 1 6973 Höchst / AT | [2024/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISELE, Olaf 6890 Lustenau / AT | [2024/22] | Representative(s) | Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte - Innsbruck Torggler & Hofmann Patentanwälte GmbH & Co KG Wilhelm-Greil-Straße 16 6020 Innsbruck / AT | [2024/22] | Application number, filing date | 22747247.9 | 19.07.2022 | [2024/22] | WO2022AT60256 | Priority number, date | AT20210050613 | 23.07.2021 Original published format: AT 506132021 | [2024/22] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023000005 | Date: | 26.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/04] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4373354 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47B88/43, A47B88/483, A47B88/49 | [2024/22] | CPC: |
A47B88/483 (EP,US);
A47B88/40 (AT);
A47B88/49 (EP);
A47B88/43 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHUBLADENAUSZIEHFÜHRUNG ZUR BEWEGBAREN LAGERUNG EINER SCHUBLADE AN EINEM MÖBELKORPUS | [2024/22] | English: | DRAWER PULL-OUT GUIDE FOR MOVABLY SUPPORTING A DRAWER ON A FURNITURE BODY | [2024/22] | French: | GLISSIÈRE TÉLESCOPIQUE DE TIROIR POUR SUPPORT MOBILE D'UN TIROIR SUR UN CORPS DE MEUBLE | [2024/22] | Entry into regional phase | 10.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 10.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/22] | 10.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]DE202009003459U (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [XAI]WO2020221669 (HETTICH PAUL GMBH & CO KG [DE]) | by applicant | EP2429340 | DE102013010577 | DE102013111076 | DE102019111292 | DE102019111655 |