EP4362997 - MICROSTRUCTURES FOR LONG-TERM MECHANICAL ADHESION TO TISSUE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 10.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Charles Stark Draper Laboratory, Inc. 555 Technology Square Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KING, Daniel Frederick Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 02 /
CARTER, David J. Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 03 /
WILLIAMS, Corin Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | 04 /
GOLMON, Stephanie Lynne Cambridge, MA 02139 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22747874.0 | 30.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35772 | Priority number, date | US202163218024P | 02.07.2021 Original published format: US 202163218024 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278731 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4362997 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61L31/02, A61F2/24, A61L31/04, A61L31/10, A61L31/14, A61L31/16 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
A61L31/022 (EP);
A61L27/50 (US);
A61F2/2418 (EP);
A61L27/54 (US);
A61L31/04 (EP);
A61L31/10 (EP);
A61L31/148 (EP);
A61L31/16 (EP);
A61F2/2415 (EP);
A61L2300/404 (EP);
A61L2300/41 (EP);
A61L2300/604 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | MIKROSTRUKTUREN FÜR DIE LANGZEIT-MECHANISCHE VERKLEBUNG AUF GEWEBE | [2024/19] | English: | MICROSTRUCTURES FOR LONG-TERM MECHANICAL ADHESION TO TISSUE | [2024/19] | French: | MICROSTRUCTURES POUR UNE ADHÉRENCE MÉCANIQUE À LONG TERME SUR UN TISSU | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 19.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 19.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 19.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2006204738 (DUBROW ROBERT S [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,37-39* claims 1-118 *; | [X]US2014249623 (MATHENY ROBERT [US]) [X] 1-53 * paragraphs [0017] - [0024] - [0029] - [0040] - [0088] , [0097] , [0098] , [0120] , [0121] * * paragraphs [0158] , [0163] , [0164] , [0233] , [ 234] , [0264] - [0268] - [0279] - [0286] * * claims 1-14 * * figures 24-27 *; | [XY]WO2014144937 (TWELVE INC [US]) [X] 1,5-36,40-53 * figures 40A-40T * * claims 1-92 * * paragraphs [0309] , [0310] , [0314] * [Y] 2-4,37-39 | by applicant | WO2019033026 | WO2019094342 |