EP4358698 - A SEAWEED FARM, A PROCESS FOR FARMING SEAWEED AND A METHOD OF PROCESSING FARMED SEAWEED [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.12.2022 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.09.2024 | New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Redrose Developments Corclough East Belmullet, Co. Mayo, F26 X967 / IE | [2024/18] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RUDDY, Ann Mayo, F26 X967 / IE | [2024/18] | Representative(s) | Mutlu, Aydin Invokat Intellectual Property Services Ltd. Kartaltepe Mh. Yildiztepe Sk. No:6-Bakirköy 34145 Istanbul / TR | [2024/18] | Application number, filing date | 22748063.9 | 24.06.2022 | [2024/18] | WO2022IB00355 | Priority number, date | GB20210009196 | 25.06.2021 Original published format: GB 202109196 | [2024/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022269353 | Date: | 29.12.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/52] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4358698 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.12.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 29.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A01G33/00 | [2024/18] | CPC: |
A01G33/00 (EP,GB);
Y02A40/80 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/18] | Title | German: | ALGENZUCHTANLAGE, VERFAHREN ZUR ALGENZUCHT UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERARBEITUNG VON ALGENZUCHT | [2024/18] | English: | A SEAWEED FARM, A PROCESS FOR FARMING SEAWEED AND A METHOD OF PROCESSING FARMED SEAWEED | [2024/18] | French: | FERME DE CULTURE D'ALGUES, PROCÉDÉ DE CULTURE D'ALGUES ET PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSFORMATION DES ALGUES CULTIVÉES | [2024/18] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/18] | 25.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report not received in time | 03.09.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | Divisional application(s) | EP24193669.9 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XYI]JP2011067173 (KONDO TOSHIO); | [A]CN104365511 (UNIV ZHEJIANG OCEAN); | [IY]US10257990 (GOUDEY CLIFFORD A [US]) |