EP4367623 - CUSTOMIZED MERCHANT PRICE RATINGS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Capital One Services, LLC 1680 Capital One Drive McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAIMAN, Tyler McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | 02 /
TIKOIAN, Kathryn McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | 03 /
ATKINS, Phoebe McLean, Virginia 22102 / US | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP, et al Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/20] | Hamer, Thomas Daniel, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22748159.5 | 01.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022US35903 | Priority number, date | US202117369325 | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US202117369325 | US202117369358 | 07.07.2021 Original published format: US202117369358 | US202117371937 | 09.07.2021 Original published format: US202117371937 | US202117372006 | 09.07.2021 Original published format: US202117372006 | [2024/20] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023283116 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4367623 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06Q30/06 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
G06Q30/0601 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ANGEPASSTE HÄNDLERPREISBEWERTUNGEN | [2024/20] | English: | CUSTOMIZED MERCHANT PRICE RATINGS | [2024/20] | French: | ÉVALUATIONS PERSONNALISÉES DE PRIX DE COMMERÇANT | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 07.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 07.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 07.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2013080364 (WILSON NATHAN R [US], et al) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *; | [A]US2017323402 (FISHBERG KEITH [US]) [A] 1-80 * the whole document *; | [A]US2019340537 (FUNG SIMON [US], et al) [A] 1-80* the whole document *; | [I]US10885039 (HORNKVIST JOHN M [US], et al) [I] 1-80 * the whole document * |