EP4366917 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A TIME-OPTIMAL TRAJECTORY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 12.04.2024 Database last updated on 28.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 13.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | 13.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 16.10.2024 [2024/42] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states STIWA AMS GMBH Salzburger Straße 52 4800 Attnang-Puchheim / AT | [2024/20] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STAUFER, Peter 4870 Vöcklamarkt / AT | 02 /
PAUDITZ, Michael 4690 Schwanenstadt / AT | [2024/20] | Representative(s) | Burger, Hannes Anwälte Burger & Partner Rechtsanwalt GmbH Rosenauerweg 16 4580 Windischgarsten / AT | [2024/20] | Application number, filing date | 22748218.9 | 07.07.2022 | [2024/20] | WO2022AT60244 | Priority number, date | AT20210050565 | 09.07.2021 Original published format: AT 505652021 | [2024/20] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023279132 | Date: | 12.01.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/02] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4366917 | Date: | 15.05.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 12.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/20] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B25J9/16 | [2024/20] | CPC: |
B25J9/1664 (EP,AT,KR,US);
B25J9/1653 (KR,US);
G05B2219/40463 (EP,KR);
G05B2219/40466 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/20] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINER ZEITOPTIMALEN TRAJEKTORIE | [2024/20] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETERMINING A TIME-OPTIMAL TRAJECTORY | [2024/20] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF POUR DÉTERMINER UNE TRAJECTOIRE OPTIMALE EN TERMES DE TEMPS | [2024/20] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.04.2023 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 08.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/20] | 08.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US6216058 (HOSEK MARTIN [US], et al); |