EP4364178 - VACUUM TUBE INSERT ASSEMBLY WITH FEED-THROUGH PIN PLUG AND MATING SOCKET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.04.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 06.01.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | 06.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 09.10.2024 [2024/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Varex Imaging Corporation 1678 South Pioneer Road Salt Lake City, UT 84104 / US | [2024/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SPENCER, Gregory Robert Salt Lake City, Utah 84104 / US | 02 /
HUBBARD, Jesse Salt Lake City, Utah 84104 / US | 03 /
COX, J. Scott Salt Lake City, Utah 84104 / US | 04 /
GRAY, Kyle Salt Lake City, Utah 84104 / US | [2024/19] | Representative(s) | Foster, Mark Charles Mathisen & Macara LLP Charta House 30-38 Church Street Staines-upon-Thames, Middlesex TW18 4EP / GB | [2024/19] | Application number, filing date | 22748550.5 | 29.06.2022 | [2024/19] | WO2022US35589 | Priority number, date | US202163217019P | 30.06.2021 Original published format: US 202163217019 P | [2024/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023278623 | Date: | 05.01.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/01] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4364178 | Date: | 08.05.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.01.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/19] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.01.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01J35/16 | [2024/19] | CPC: |
H01J35/165 (EP,US);
H01J35/06 (US);
H05G1/04 (US);
H01J2235/023 (EP);
H01J2235/06 (US);
H01J2235/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/19] | Title | German: | VAKUUMRÖHRENEINSATZANORDNUNG MIT DURCHFÜHRUNGSSTIFTSTECKER UND GEGENBUCHSE | [2024/19] | English: | VACUUM TUBE INSERT ASSEMBLY WITH FEED-THROUGH PIN PLUG AND MATING SOCKET | [2024/19] | French: | ENSEMBLE INSERT DE TUBE À VIDE À FICHE DE BROCHE TRAVERSANTE ET DOUILLE D'ACCOUPLEMENT | [2024/19] | Entry into regional phase | 09.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 09.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/19] | 09.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 10.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]CH212929 (LORENZ C AG [DE]) |