EP4280227 - CONTROL ROD ABSORBER ASSEMBLY, CONTROL ROD AND CONTROL ROD ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states China Nuclear Power Technology Research Institute Co., Ltd Room 1502-1504, 1506, Floor 15 Science Building, West Shangbu Zhong Road Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518031 / CN | For all designated states China General Nuclear Power Corporation 33 Floor, South Building CGN Tower 2002, Shennan Boulevard Futian District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518028 / CN | For all designated states China Nuclear Power Engineering Company Ltd. Engineering Company Office Building Daya Bay Nuclear Power Base Pengfei Road Dapeng New District Shenzen, Gaungdong 518000 / CN | For all designated states CGN Power Co., Ltd. 18/F South Building CGN Tower 2002, Shennan Boulevard Futian District Shenzen, Guangdong 518028 / CN | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XUE, Zhe Shenzhen, Guangdong 518031 / CN | 02 /
PANG, Zhengzheng Shenzhen, Guangdong 518031 / CN | 03 /
LI, Weicai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518031 / CN | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Westphal, Mussgnug & Partner, Patentanwälte mbB Werinherstraße 79 81541 München / DE | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22748792.3 | 05.01.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022CN70364 | Priority number, date | CN202110170970 | 08.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110170970 | [2023/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022166513 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4280227 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G21C7/103, G21C7/10, G21C7/11, G21C7/117 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
G21C7/103 (EP,CN);
G21C7/10 (CN);
G21C7/11 (CN);
G21C7/117 (EP);
Y02E30/30 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | G21C7/103, G21C7/10, G21C7/11 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | ABSORBERANORDNUNG FÜR STEUERSTAB, STEUERSTAB UND STEUERSTABANORDNUNG | [2023/47] | English: | CONTROL ROD ABSORBER ASSEMBLY, CONTROL ROD AND CONTROL ROD ASSEMBLY | [2023/47] | French: | ENSEMBLE ABSORBEUR DE TIGE DE COMMANDE, TIGE DE COMMANDE ET ENSEMBLE TIGE DE COMMANDE | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 14.08.2023 | Translation filed | 14.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]EP0364910 (BBC REAKTOR GMBH [DE]); | [XY]US2001033632 (MURAKAMI KAZUO [JP], et al); | [Y]US2009034674 (BURGER JOSEPH M [US], et al); | [Y]CN103971760 (CHINA NUCLEAR POWER TECHNOLOGY RES INST CO LTD, et al); | [Y]CN110752044 (NUCLEAR POWER INST CHINA); | [PX]CN113012828 (CHINA NUCLEAR POWER INST CO LTD, et al) |