EP4290919 - INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD, PROCESSING METHOD, NODE, NETWORK SIDE DEVICE, AND APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Datang Mobile Communications Equipment Co., Ltd. 1/F, Building 1, No. 5 Shangdi East Road Haidian District Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Mingzhu Beijing 100085 / CN | 02 /
YAN, Nan Beijing 100085 / CN | 03 /
ZENG, Erlin Beijing 100085 / CN | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | dompatent von Kreisler Selting Werner - Partnerschaft von Patent- und Rechtsanwälten mbB Deichmannhaus am Dom Bahnhofsvorplatz 1 50667 Köln / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22748938.2 | 24.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022CN73538 | Priority number, date | CN202110150460 | 03.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110150460 | [2023/50] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022166659 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4290919 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/04, H04W76/18, H04W76/19, H04W36/00, H04W36/30, // H04L45/28, H04W40/24, H04W40/34 | [2024/30] | CPC: |
H04W36/00 (EP);
H04W40/02 (CN,US);
H04W36/305 (EP,US);
H04W76/18 (US);
H04W76/19 (EP);
H04L45/28 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/50] | H04W24/04, H04W76/18, H04W76/19 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSERFASSUNGSVERFAHREN, VERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN, KNOTEN, NETZWERKSEITIGE VORRICHTUNG UND VORRICHTUNG | [2023/50] | English: | INFORMATION ACQUISITION METHOD, PROCESSING METHOD, NODE, NETWORK SIDE DEVICE, AND APPARATUS | [2023/50] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ACQUISITION D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT, NOEUD, DISPOSITIF CÔTÉ RÉSEAU ET APPAREIL | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 01.09.2023 | Translation filed | 01.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 01.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 01.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]WO2020059633 (SHARP KK [JP]); | International search | [A]CN111565408 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD); | [X]WO2020192603 (ZTE CORP [CN]); | [X]CN111757362 (ZTE CORP); |