EP4289576 - ELECTRIC SHAVER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 07.08.2024 [2024/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKUDA Ichiro Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0057 / JP | 02 /
SUGIURA Akiho Kadoma-shi Osaka 571-0057 / JP | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22749654.4 | 31.01.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022JP03567 | Priority number, date | JP20210016434 | 04.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021016434 | [2023/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022168782 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4289576 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/48, A61B5/00, A61B5/053, A61B5/0531 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
B26B19/388 (EP);
A61B5/0077 (EP);
A61B5/0531 (EP);
A61B5/0537 (EP);
A61B5/441 (EP);
A61B5/443 (EP);
A61B5/6843 (EP);
A61B5/6887 (EP);
B26B19/48 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | ELEKTRISCHER RASIERER | [2023/50] | English: | ELECTRIC SHAVER | [2023/50] | French: | RASOIR ÉLECTRIQUE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 26.06.2023 | Translation filed | 26.06.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.06.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.06.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.06.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2014137883 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]); | [A]US2016107323 (KRANS JAN MARTIJN [NL], et al); | [A]WO2019224037 (BIC VIOLEX SA [GR]) | International search | [AX]US2014137883 (ROTHSCHILD LEIGH M [US]); | [A]WO2018153719 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]WO2018166902 (KONINKLIJKE PHILIPS NV [NL]); | [A]JP2020512074 | by applicant | JPS6021746 |