EP4289884 - POROUS PARTICLES AND PURGING AGENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | 05.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 08.05.2024 [2024/19] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kuraray Co., Ltd. 1621, Sakazu Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 710-0801 / JP | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI Makoto Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 713-8550 / JP | 02 /
OSHITA Mizuko Kurashiki-shi, Okayama 713-8550 / JP | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22749708.8 | 01.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022JP03868 | Priority number, date | JP20210014926 | 02.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021014926 | [2023/50] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022168836 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4289884 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/12, B29C33/72, B29C48/27, C08J9/28 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
C08J9/28 (EP,KR,US);
C08J9/16 (KR);
C08L23/06 (US);
B29C33/722 (KR);
B29C48/27 (KR,US);
C08J3/12 (EP);
C08J9/0061 (KR);
C08J9/0066 (KR);
C08K3/08 (EP,KR);
C08L23/00 (KR);
C08L23/0861 (KR);
B29C33/72 (EP);
B29C48/022 (EP);
B29C48/03 (EP);
B29K2223/083 (EP);
C08J2205/042 (EP,US);
C08J2205/044 (US);
C08J2323/00 (KR);
| C-Set: |
C08K3/08, C08L23/0861 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | PORÖSE PARTIKEL UND REINIGUNGSMITTEL | [2023/50] | English: | POROUS PARTICLES AND PURGING AGENT | [2023/50] | French: | PARTICULES POREUSES ET AGENT DE PURGE | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 24.08.2023 | Translation filed | 31.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2008279623 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND) [A] 1-7 * entire text *; | [A]WO2012133252 (KURARAY CO [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * entire text *; | [A]JP2012533647 (MSI TECHNOLOGY LLC) [A] 1-7* entire text *; | [A]WO2018124233 (NIPPON SYNTHETIC CHEM IND CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-7 * entire text * | by applicant | JPH1016023 | JP2008279623 |