EP4287949 - SCREEN PRINTED ELECTRODES FOR AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CB Innovations, LLC 8710 Tillage Lane San Diego, CA 92127 / US | [2023/50] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DUNPHY, Stephen Escondido, CA 92029 / US | 02 /
MCCLUNG, Christain Escondido, CA 92029 / US | [2023/50] | Representative(s) | Tomkins & Co 5 Dartmouth Road Dublin 6, D06 F9C7 / IE | [2023/50] | Application number, filing date | 22750442.0 | 04.02.2022 | [2023/50] | WO2022US15259 | Priority number, date | US202163147191P | 08.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163147191 P | [2023/50] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022170057 | Date: | 11.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/32] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4287949 | Date: | 13.12.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.08.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/50] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 11.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/28 | [2023/50] | CPC: |
A61B5/282 (EP);
A61B5/6805 (EP);
A61B5/6823 (EP);
A61B2562/0209 (EP);
A61N1/046 (EP);
A61N1/0484 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/50] | Title | German: | SIEBGEDRUCKTE ELEKTRODEN FÜR EINEN ELEKTROKARDIOGRAMMARTIKEL | [2023/50] | English: | SCREEN PRINTED ELECTRODES FOR AN ELECTROCARDIOGRAM ARTICLE | [2023/50] | French: | ÉLECTRODES SÉRIGRAPHIÉES DESTINÉES À UN ARTICLE POUR ÉLECTROCARDIOGRAMME | [2023/50] | Entry into regional phase | 12.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/50] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]US2015250420 (LONGINOTTI-BUITONI GIANLUIGI [US], et al) [X] 1-3, 5-13, 15-20 * , paragraphs [0017], [0027], [0031], [0052], [0161], [0163], [0165], [0208], [0220], [0289] * [Y] 4, 14,21; | [Y]US10285617 (TOTH LANDY [US], et al) [Y] 4, 14,21* , column 15, lines 1-5 * |