EP4377708 - MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM GENERATING ANTI-NOISE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 17.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | 27.09.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 30.10.2024 [2024/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Koninklijke Philips N.V. High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAYAPALAN, Manivannan 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Philips Intellectual Property & Standards High Tech Campus 52 5656 AG Eindhoven / NL | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22751072.4 | 15.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP69927 | Priority number, date | EP20210187716 | 26.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21187716 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006456 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377708 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01R33/54, G10K11/178, G01R33/385 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G01R33/543 (EP);
G01R33/283 (EP);
G10K11/17821 (EP);
G10K11/17873 (EP);
G01R33/3854 (EP);
G10K2210/1161 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | ANTI-RAUSCH-ERZEUGENDES MAGNETRESONANZBILDGEBUNGSSYSTEM | [2024/23] | English: | MAGNETIC RESONANCE IMAGING SYSTEM GENERATING ANTI-NOISE | [2024/23] | French: | SYSTÈME D'IMAGERIE PAR RÉSONANCE MAGNÉTIQUE GÉNÉRANT UN ANTI-BRUIT | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 26.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XAI]US2021161498 (HU LINGZHI [US]) | by applicant | DE102013219309 |