EP4292547 - ABLATION SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | 12.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 15.05.2024 [2024/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Dinova EP Technology Co., Ltd. Room 316, Floor 3, Building 2 No.88 Jiangling Road Xixing Street Binjiang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WANG, Kun Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 02 /
LI, Jianmin Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Zhixin Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 04 /
YOU, Yan Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | 05 /
QIU, Jiaming Hangzhou, Zhejiang 310052 / CN | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Petraz, Gilberto Luigi, et al GLP S.r.l. Viale Europa Unita, 171 33100 Udine / IT | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22752301.6 | 09.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022CN75719 | Priority number, date | CN202110177082 | 09.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110177082 | CN202110638975 | 08.06.2021 Original published format: CN202110638975 | CN202111510577 | 10.12.2021 Original published format: CN202111510577 | [2023/51] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022171141 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4292547 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/12, A61B18/14 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61B18/1492 (EP,US);
A61B17/12122 (EP,US);
A61B17/12172 (EP);
A61B17/12177 (EP);
A61B17/12168 (US);
A61B2017/00929 (EP);
A61B2017/1205 (EP,US);
A61B2018/0022 (EP);
A61B2018/00267 (EP);
A61B2018/00357 (EP,US);
A61B2018/00375 (EP);
A61B2018/00577 (US);
A61B2018/00613 (EP);
A61B2018/00767 (US);
A61B2018/00839 (EP);
A61B2018/1407 (US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | ABLATIONSSYSTEM | [2023/51] | English: | ABLATION SYSTEM | [2023/51] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ABLATION | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 31.08.2023 | Translation filed | 31.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 31.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 31.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103385754 (BIOSENSE WEBSTER ISRAEL LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]CN108784896 (HANGZHOU NUOSHENG MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [A]CN110327112 (BEIJING BALANCE MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [X]CN111166461 (HANGZHOU DINOVA MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-27 * description, paragraphs [0076]-[0209], and figures 1-20 *; | [X]CN111329576 (HANGZHOU NUORUI MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-27 * description, paragraphs [0032]-[0085], and figures 1-15 *; | [A]CN111388085 (SICHUAN JINJIANG ELECTRONIC SCIENCE & TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-27 * entire document *; | [X]CN212165884U (HANGZHOU NUORUI MEDICAL TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-27 * description, paragraphs [0040]-[0125], and figures 1-10 *; | [A]US2020397505 (VISWANATHAN RAJU [US], et al) [A] 1-27* entire document * |