EP4293749 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERIES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIN-ETSU CHEMICAL CO., LTD. 4-1, Marunouchi 1 chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1000005 / JP | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUNO Takumi Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0125 / JP | 02 /
HIROSE Takakazu Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0125 / JP | 03 /
TAKAHASHI Kohta Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0125 / JP | 04 /
OSAWA Yusuke Annaka-shi, Gunma 379-0125 / JP | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2023/51] | Sonnenhauser, Thomas Martin Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22752643.1 | 02.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022JP03917 | Priority number, date | JP20210021701 | 15.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021021701 | [2023/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022172815 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293749 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/36, H01M4/48, H01M4/58 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C01B33/32 (EP,KR);
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR);
C01B33/325 (US);
C01B33/113 (EP);
H01M10/052 (EP,KR,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/36 (EP);
H01M4/364 (EP);
H01M4/366 (EP,KR);
H01M4/48 (EP);
H01M4/485 (EP);
H01M4/58 (EP);
H01M4/625 (EP);
C01P2002/72 (US);
C01P2004/61 (US);
C01P2004/86 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODENAKTIVMATERIAL FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIEN MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG DAVON UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2023/51] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE ACTIVE MATERIAL FOR NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERIES, METHOD FOR PRODUCING SAME, AND NONAQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2023/51] | French: | MATÉRIAU ACTIF D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIES SECONDAIRES À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX, SON PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION, ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2023 | Translation filed | 09.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2017195015 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-15; | [A]JP2020113495 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) [A] 1-15; | [PA]WO2021153077 (PANASONIC IP MAN CO LTD [JP])[PA] 1-15 | by applicant | JPH06325765 | JP2001185127 | JP2002042806 | JP2006114454 | JP2006164954 | JP2007234255 | JP2008177346 | JP2008251369 | JP2008282819 | JP2009070825 | JP2009205950 | JP2009212074 |