EP4293086 - METHOD OF REMOVING POLLUTANTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JOCHI, Yuto Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | 02 /
USHIO, Noriaki Tokyo 131-8501 / JP | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22752852.8 | 14.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022JP05562 | Priority number, date | JP20210021152 | 12.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021021152 | [2023/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022173030 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293086 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C09D201/00, B05D3/12, B05D7/24, B08B3/08, B08B7/00, C09D7/65, C09D101/02, C09D125/08, C09D129/04, C09D133/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
C09D5/20 (EP);
B08B7/0014 (EP,US);
C08L1/26 (EP);
C08L5/00 (EP);
C09D101/26 (EP);
C09D105/00 (EP);
C09D129/04 (EP);
C09D183/12 (EP);
C09D7/20 (EP);
C09D7/65 (EP);
C08G77/46 (EP);
C08L2205/02 (EP);
C08L2205/03 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C09D129/04, C08L83/08 (EP);
C09D129/04, C08L83/08, C08L83/12 (EP);
C09D129/04, C08L83/12 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ENTFERNUNG VON SCHADSTOFFEN | [2023/51] | English: | METHOD OF REMOVING POLLUTANTS | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉLIMINATION DE POLLUANTS | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2023 | Translation filed | 09.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JPS59123778 (GEN ANILINE & FILM CORP) [A] 1-15 * claims, examples *; | [A]JPS63189476 (MIYAHARA HISAO) [A] 1-15 * claims, examples *; | [A]JP2013209562 (KAJIMA CORP, et al) [A] 1-15* claims, examples, paragraphs [0034], [0046], [0071] * |