EP4293025 - 4-AMINOQUINAZOLINE COMPOUND [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | 19.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 22.05.2024 [2024/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Astellas Pharma Inc. 5-1, Nihonbashi-Honcho 2-Chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2023/51] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KAWAGUCHI, Kenichi Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 02 /
KURAMOTO, Kazuyuki Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 03 /
IMAIZUMI, Tomoyoshi Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 04 /
MORIKAWA, Takahiro Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 05 /
OKUMURA, Mitsuaki Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 06 /
IMADA, Sunao Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 07 /
KAWAMINAMI, Eiji Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 08 /
SATO, Ryo Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 09 /
SEKI, Yohei Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 10 /
HAMAGUCHI, Hisao Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 11 /
ISHIOKA, Hiroki Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 12 /
FUKUDOME, Hiroki Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 13 /
KURIWAKI, Ikumi Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | 14 /
NAGASHIMA, Takeyuki Tokyo 103-8411 / JP | [2023/51] | Representative(s) | Potter Clarkson Chapel Quarter Mount Street Nottingham NG1 6HQ / GB | [2023/51] | Application number, filing date | 22752855.1 | 14.02.2022 | [2023/51] | WO2022JP05583 | Priority number, date | JP20210021684 | 15.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021021684 | [2023/51] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022173033 | Date: | 18.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/33] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4293025 | Date: | 20.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/08, A61K31/517, A61K31/519, A61K31/5383, A61P35/00, C07D519/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR,US);
C07D487/08 (EP,KR,US);
A61K31/517 (KR);
A61K31/519 (KR);
A61K31/5383 (KR);
C07D519/00 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/51] | Title | German: | 4-AMINOCHINAZOLINVERBINDUNG | [2023/51] | English: | 4-AMINOQUINAZOLINE COMPOUND | [2023/51] | French: | COMPOSÉ DE 4-AMINOQUINAZOLINE | [2023/51] | Entry into regional phase | 13.09.2023 | Translation filed | 13.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 13.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.09.2023 | Examination requested [2023/51] | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2017172979 (ARAXES PHARMA LLC [US]); | [A]WO2018143315 (ASTELLAS PHARMA INC [JP]); | [PA]WO2021106231 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al); | [PA]WO2021107160 (TAIHO PHARMACEUTICAL CO LTD [JP], et al) |