EP4377028 - METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A LIKELIHOOD OF DEFECTS IN A CAST PRODUCT SECTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HAHN, Susanne 4040 Linz / AT | 02 /
KALTSEIS, Rainer 4060 Leonding / AT | 03 /
RIESE, Axel 4030 Linz / AT | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Metals@Linz Primetals Technologies Austria GmbH Intellectual Property Upstream IP UP Turmstraße 44 4031 Linz / AT | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22755213.0 | 27.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP71116 | Priority number, date | EP20210188240 | 28.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21188240 | [2024/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006834 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377028 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B22D11/16 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
B22D11/16 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FESTSTELLUNG EINER DEFEKTWAHRSCHEINLICHKEIT EINES GEGOSSENEN PRODUKTABSCHNITTES | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD FOR ESTABLISHING A LIKELIHOOD OF DEFECTS IN A CAST PRODUCT SECTION | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT D'UNE PROBABILITÉ DE DÉFAUTS DANS UNE SECTION DE PRODUIT COULÉ | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9631304 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al); | [A]DE102012203436 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS INC [US]); | [A]DE102019206264 (SMS GROUP GMBH [DE]) |