EP4296055 - MULTILAYER BODY, CARD, PASSPORT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARD, METHOD FOR PRODUCING PASSPORT, AND LASER MARKING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.11.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.08.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Chemical Corporation 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2023/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEZUKA, Rie Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 02 /
KOIDO, Yuko Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | 03 /
SAKATA, Nobuhiro Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2023/52] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2023/52] | Application number, filing date | 22756281.6 | 17.02.2022 | [2023/52] | WO2022JP06498 | Priority number, date | JP20210024678 | 18.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021024678 | [2023/52] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022176964 | Date: | 25.08.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/34] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4296055 | Date: | 27.12.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/52] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.08.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/20, B32B27/30, B41M5/30, B41M5/40, B42D25/23, B42D25/24, B42D25/41, B42D25/455, B42D25/46 | [2024/37] | CPC: |
B32B27/08 (EP,US);
B29B7/02 (US);
B32B27/20 (EP,US);
B32B27/308 (EP);
B32B27/32 (EP,US);
B32B27/36 (EP);
B32B27/365 (EP,US);
B41M5/267 (EP);
B41M5/30 (EP);
B41M5/323 (EP);
B41M5/3333 (EP);
B41M5/3335 (EP);
B41M5/3372 (EP);
B41M5/40 (US);
B42D25/23 (EP,US);
B42D25/24 (EP,US);
B42D25/41 (EP);
B42D25/455 (EP);
B42D25/46 (EP);
B29C48/21 (US);
B29K2023/00 (US);
B29K2067/00 (US);
B29K2069/00 (US);
B29K2105/0032 (US);
B29L2017/00 (US);
B32B2250/24 (US);
B32B2307/4026 (EP,US);
B32B2307/718 (EP);
B32B2307/7376 (EP,US);
B32B2425/00 (EP,US);
B41M5/327 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/52] | B32B27/20, B41M5/40, B42D25/23, B42D25/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/52] | Title | German: | MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPER, KARTE, PASS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES MEHRSCHICHTKÖRPERS, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER KARTE, VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PASSES UND LASERMARKIERUNGSVERFAHREN | [2023/52] | English: | MULTILAYER BODY, CARD, PASSPORT, METHOD FOR PRODUCING MULTILAYER BODY, METHOD FOR PRODUCING CARD, METHOD FOR PRODUCING PASSPORT, AND LASER MARKING METHOD | [2023/52] | French: | CORPS MULTICOUCHE, CARTE, PASSEPORT, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN CORPS MULTICOUCHE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE CARTE, PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION DE PASSEPORT ET PROCÉDÉ DE MARQUAGE AU LASER | [2023/52] | Entry into regional phase | 10.08.2023 | Translation filed | 10.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/52] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAYI]JPH04368881 (CANON KK); | [Y]JPH09302236 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]US2017340955 (COVE MICHAEL GERALD [US]); | [Y]JP2019104195 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) | International search | [A]JPH02103177 (GOYO SHIKO KK); | [X]JPH04368881 (CANON KK); | [A]JPH09302236 (TEIJIN LTD); | [A]US2017340955 (COVE MICHAEL GERALD [US]); | [A]JP2019104195 (TOPPAN FORMS CO LTD) | by applicant | US3209013 | JPH0859603 | JPH10258577 | JP2002301873 | WO02081229 | WO02098674 | WO2004111106 | JP3913820B | JP4004289B | WO2007148604 | JP4601174B | JP2011105638 | JP2016165835 | WO2017047572 | JP2017165091 |