EP4384433 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Continental Autonomous Mobility Germany GmbH Ringlerstraße 17 85057 Ingolstadt / DE | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHRADER, Moritz 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Continental Corporation c/o Continental Automotive GmbH Intellectual Property Nordostpark 30 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22758139.4 | 03.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022DE200176 | Priority number, date | DE202110208814 | 12.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021208814 | [2024/25] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023016613 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384433 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B62D5/04, B60W30/10, B62D15/02, G05D1/02, G05B11/40, G05B11/42 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B62D5/046 (EP);
B60W30/10 (EP);
B60W50/00 (EP);
B62D15/025 (EP);
B62D5/0481 (EP);
B60W2050/0001 (EP);
B60W2050/0008 (EP);
B60W2510/202 (EP);
B60W2520/125 (EP);
B60W2520/14 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM ZUR STEUERUNG EINES FAHRZEUGS | [2024/25] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR CONTROLLING A VEHICLE | [2024/25] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME DE COMMANDE D'UN VÉHICULE | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2024 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.03.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.03.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 12.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 18.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |