EP4377910 - APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RATING AN ENTROPY OF A PREDEFINED SPACE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | For:AL
Sony Europe B.V. The Heights, Brooklands Weybridge, Surrey KT13 0XW / GB | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PFLUG, Anja 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 02 /
BAILADOR DEL POZO, Gonzalo 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 03 /
ERYILMAZ, Serkan 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 04 /
JANSSENS, Inge 70327 Stuttgart / DE | 05 /
EMBRECHTS, Hugo 70327 Stuttgart / DE | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | 2SPL Patentanwälte PartG mbB Landaubogen 3 81373 München / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22758181.6 | 27.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP71123 | Priority number, date | EP20210188115 | 28.07.2021 Original published format: EP 21188115 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023006839 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377910 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06V20/52, G06V10/54, G06V10/74, G06V10/764, G06V20/70 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G06V20/52 (EP);
G06V10/26 (EP);
G06V10/761 (EP);
G06V10/764 (EP);
G06V20/17 (EP);
G06V20/70 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG, SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR BEWERTUNG EINER ENTROPIE EINES VORDEFINIERTEN RAUMS | [2024/23] | English: | APPARATUS, SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR RATING AN ENTROPY OF A PREDEFINED SPACE | [2024/23] | French: | APPAREIL, SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ POUR ÉVALUER UNE ENTROPIE D'UN ESPACE PRÉDÉFINI | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 28.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 28.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 28.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]JP2020086736 (LIXIL CORP); | [XI]US2021027485 (ZHANG LE [US]); | [XI]WO2021126074 (ULTRON TECHNIQUES PTE LTD [SG]) |