EP4277139 - RADIO FREQUENCY MODULE AND ANTENNA SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.06.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | 14.06.2024 | Change - classification | published on 17.07.2024 [2024/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Ting Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | 02 /
TONG, Lin Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Penza, Giancarlo Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22758723.5 | 20.01.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022CN73000 | Priority number, date | CN202110214557 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110214557 | [2023/46] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022179357 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277139 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.06.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H04B1/40, H04B1/00 | [2024/29] | CPC: |
H04B1/006 (EP);
H04B1/04 (CN);
H04B1/44 (US);
H04B1/0064 (EP,US);
H04B1/0067 (CN);
H04L5/1461 (US)
|
Former IPC [2023/46] | H04B1/40 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | FUNKFREQUENZMODUL UND ANTENNENSYSTEM SOWIE ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG | [2023/46] | English: | RADIO FREQUENCY MODULE AND ANTENNA SYSTEM, AND ELECTRONIC DEVICE | [2023/46] | French: | MODULE RADIOFRÉQUENCE ET SYSTÈME D'ANTENNE, ET DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE | [2023/46] | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2023 | Translation filed | 09.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2014170990 (BLACK GREGORY R [US], et al); | [X]EP2672630 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); | [X]CN111628800 (REALME CHONGQING MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD); | [X]CN112187297 (GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD) | International search | [A]WO2012113353 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN], et al); | [A]CN105827269 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [A]CN111245483 (SHENZHEN JIXIANG TENDA TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN111525933 (VIVO COMM TECHNOLOGY CO LTD); | [X]CN111628800 (REALME CHONGQING MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP LTD); | [A]CN111817733 (HUIZHOU TCL MOBILE COMMUNICATION CO LTD) |