EP4299591 - PREPARATION OF SIGLEC-15 BINDING PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Jemincare Pharmaceuticals Co., Ltd. 1st Floor, Block 1 No. 1118 Halei Road Pilot Free Trade Zone Pudong New Area, Shanghai 201203 / CN | For all designated states Jiangxi Jemincare Group Co., Ltd. Block 14, Zhongxing Nanchang Software Park Industrial Park No.688 Aixihu North Road Nanchang Hi-Tech Industrial Development Zone Nanchang, Jiangxi 330096 / CN | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YANG, Xinxiu Shanghai 201203 / CN | 02 /
GU, Chunyin Shanghai 201203 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Zongda Shanghai 201203 / CN | 04 /
CAO, Xiaodan Shanghai 201203 / CN | 05 /
LIU, Xiaowu Shanghai 201203 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Peipei Shanghai 201203 / CN | 07 /
YANG, Lu Shanghai 201203 / CN | 08 /
DENG, Sujun Shanghai 201203 / CN | 09 /
PAN, Zhongzong Shanghai 201203 / CN | 10 /
WANG, Xueping Shanghai 201203 / CN | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow SL7 1YL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2024/01] | Sagittarius IP Marlow International Parkway Marlow, SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 22758847.2 | 22.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022CN77193 | Priority number, date | CN202110202065 | 23.02.2021 Original published format: CN202110202065 | [2024/01] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022179483 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299591 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07K16/28, C12N15/13, A61K39/395, A61P35/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,KR);
C07K16/2803 (EP,KR,US);
A61P37/06 (US);
C12N15/63 (US);
G01N33/6854 (US);
A61K2039/505 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/14 (US);
C07K2317/56 (KR);
C07K2317/565 (KR,US);
C07K2317/567 (US);
C07K2317/622 (EP,KR);
C07K2317/73 (KR,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | HERSTELLUNG VON SIGLEC-15-BINDUNGSPROTEIN UND VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2024/01] | English: | PREPARATION OF SIGLEC-15 BINDING PROTEIN AND USE THEREOF | [2024/01] | French: | PRÉPARATION DE PROTÉINE DE LIAISON DE SIGLEC-15 ET SON UTILISATION | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2023 | Translation filed | 14.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2011041894 (ALETHIA BIOTHERAPEUTICS INC [CA], et al) [A] 1-122 * entire document *; | [A]WO2013147213 (DAIICHI SANKYO CO LTD [JP]) [A] 1-122 * entire document *; | [A]CN110386982 (GUANGDONG 999 BRAIN HOSPITAL, et al) [A] 1-122 * entire document *; | [A]CN111378043 (UNIV NANJING MEDICAL) [A] 1-122 * entire document *; | [A]CN111875708 (ZHEJIANG COMPVSS BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-122 * entire document *; | [A] - Sasa Chu, Na You, Maorong Wang, "Progress on Siglecs in Sepsis", Chinese Journal of Experimental and Clinical Infectious Diseases(Electronic Edition), (20181015), vol. 12, no. 5, doi:10.3877/cma.j.issn.1674-1358, pages 417 - 421, XP055962545 [A] 1-122 * pp. 417-421 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.3877/cma.j.issn.1674-1358 | [A] - Zheng, Yu, "Research Progress of The Relationship Between Siglec Families and Atherosclerosis Associated Immune Cells", Nucleic Acids Research, Oxford University Press, GB, GB , (20171231), vol. 25, no. 7, doi:10.1093/nar/gkv1239, ISSN 0305-1048, XP055962547 [A] 1-122 * pp. 732-736 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1093/nar/gkv1239 | [A] - Sato Dai; Takahata Masahiko; Ota Masahiro; Fukuda Chie; Hasegawa Tomoka; Yamamoto Tomomaya; Amizuka Norio; Tsuda Eisuke; Okada Akiko; Hiruma Yoshiharu; Fujita Ryo; Iwasaki Norimasa, "Siglec-15-targeting therapy protects against glucocorticoid-induced osteoporosis of growing skeleton in juvenile rats", BONE, PERGAMON PRESS., OXFORD, GB, GB , (20200323), vol. 135, doi:10.1016/j.bone.2020.115331, ISSN 8756-3282, XP086148956 [A] 1-122 * article 115331, pp. 1-10 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bone.2020.115331 | [A] - Wang Jun; Sun Jingwei; Liu Linda N.; Flies Dallas B.; Nie Xinxin; Toki Maria; Zhang Jianping; Song Chang; Zarr Melissa; Zhou Xu; Han Xue; Archer Kristina A.; O’Neill Thomas; Herbst Roy S.; Boto Agedi N.; Sanmamed Miguel F.; Langermann Solomon; Rimm David L.; Chen Lieping, "Siglec-15 as an immune suppressor and potential target for normalization cancer immunotherapy", Nature Medicine, Nature Publishing Group US, New York, New York, (20190304), vol. 25, no. 4, doi:10.1038/s41591-019-0374-x, ISSN 1078-8956, pages 656 - 666, XP036749914 [A] 1-122 * pp. 656-666 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/s41591-019-0374-x | by applicant | - "Uniprot", Database accession no. P10966 | - LEFRANC et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (19990000), vol. 27, pages 209 - 212 | - RUIZ et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20000000), vol. 28, pages 219 - 221 | - LEFRANC et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20010000), vol. 29, pages 207 - 209 | - LEFRANC et al., Nucleic Acids Res., (20030000), vol. 31, pages 307 - 310 | - LEFRANC et al., DevComp Immunol, (20050000), vol. 29, pages 185 - 203 | - KABAT EAWU TT, Ann NY AcadSci, (19710000), vol. 190, pages 382 - 391 | - WARD et al., Nature, (19891000), vol. 341, no. 6242, pages 544 - 6 | - HOLT et al., Trends Biotechnol., (20030000), vol. 21, no. 11, pages 484 - 490 | - VANLANDSCHOOT P. et al., Antiviral Research, (20110000), vol. 92, pages 389 - 407 | - W. R. PEARSOND. J. LIPMAN, "Improved Tools for Biological Sequence Comparison", Proc. Natl. Acad. Sci., (19880000), vol. 85, pages 2444 - 2448 | - D. J. LIPMANW. R. PEARSON, "Rapid and Sensitive Protein Similarity Searches", Science, (19890000), vol. 227, pages 1435 - 1441 | - S. ALTSCHULW. GISHW. MILLERE. W. MYERSD. LIPMAN, "A Basic Local Alignment Search Tool", J. Mol. Biol., (19900000), vol. 215, pages 403 - 410 | - BRUMMELL et al., Biochem, (19930000), vol. 32, pages 1180 - 8 | - DE WILDT et al., Prot. Eng., (19970000), vol. 10, pages 835 - 41 | - KOMISSAROV et al., J. Biol. Chem., (19970000), vol. 272, pages 26864 - 26870 | - HALL et al., J. Immunol., (19920000), vol. 149, pages 1605 - 12 | - KELLEYO'CONNELL, Biochem., (19930000), vol. 32, pages 6862 - 35 | - ADIB-CONQUY et al., Int. Immunol., (19980000), vol. 10, pages 341 - 6 | - BEERS et al., Clin. Can. Res., (20000000), vol. 6, pages 2835 - 43 |