EP4299653 - RESIN COMPOSITION, MOLDED BODY, AND ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE ABSORBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION 1-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8251 / JP | [2024/03] |
Former [2024/01] | For all designated states Mitsubishi Engineering-Plastics Corporation 9-2, Higashi-shinbashi 1-Chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-0021 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ISEKI Shuta Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 02 /
SHOJI Hidekazu Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | 03 /
KITAGAWA Satomi Hiratsuka-shi, Kanagawa 254-0016 / JP | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22759732.5 | 24.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022JP07629 | Priority number, date | JP20210028685 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021028685 | JP20210028686 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021028686 | JP20210028687 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021028687 | JP20210028688 | 25.02.2021 Original published format: JP 2021028688 | JP20210204657 | 16.12.2021 Original published format: JP 2021204657 | [2024/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022181697 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299653 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.07.2024 | Classification | IPC: | C08J3/22, C08K7/06, C08L25/04, C08L67/02, C08L101/00, C08J5/18, H01B1/24, H01B5/16, C08K3/01, C08K3/04, H05K9/00 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C08K3/041 (EP,US);
C08L67/02 (EP,US);
B29C48/022 (EP,US);
C08J3/22 (EP);
C08J5/18 (EP);
C08K3/01 (EP);
C08K3/04 (EP);
C08K7/06 (EP);
C08L101/00 (EP);
C08L25/04 (EP);
H01B1/24 (EP);
H01B5/16 (EP);
H05K9/00 (EP);
B29K2025/06 (US);
B29K2067/006 (US);
B29K2105/167 (US);
C08K2201/001 (EP,US);
C08K2201/005 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08L67/02, C08K3/041, C08L25/06 (EP);
C08L67/02, C08K3/041, C08L67/02 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG, FORMKÖRPER UND ABSORBER FÜR ELEKTROMAGNETISCHE WELLEN | [2024/01] | English: | RESIN COMPOSITION, MOLDED BODY, AND ELECTROMAGNETIC WAVE ABSORBER | [2024/01] | French: | COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE, CORPS MOULÉ, ET CORPS ABSORBANT LES ONDES ÉLECTROMAGNÉTIQUES | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.01.2023 | Translation filed | 25.01.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.01.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.01.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.01.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.01.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JP2003100147 (NAGASE & CO LTD); | [X]JP2004331777 (YAMAGUCHI HIDEKO); | [X]US2014011011 (FUJINO SHINGO [JP], et al); | [XD]JP2019056035 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP); | [E]EP4171188 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) | International search | [AX]JP2003100147 (NAGASE & CO LTD); | [AX]JP2005162814 (TOSOH CORP); | [AX]JP2009197056 (TEIJIN CHEMICALS LTD); | [AX]JP2018021117 (KATANO SENKAKU KK); | [AX]WO2019167854 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JP2005344065 | JP2010155993 | JP2010174223 | JP2011132550 | WO2017038949 | JP2018070722 | JP2019056035 | JP2019197048 |