EP4297668 - METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A THERAPEUTIC ULTRASONIC INTERVENTIONAL SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 29.04.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waveclear Inc. 5340 Fryling Road, Suite 203 Erie, PA 16510 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASTERS, Jonathan Erie, PA 16510 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Zacco Denmark A/S Arne Jacobsens Allé 15 2300 Copenhagen S / DK | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22760271.1 | 22.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US17286 | Priority number, date | US202163207339P | 23.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163207339 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182645 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297668 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/22, A61B17/32, A61M29/00, A61N7/00, B06B3/02 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
B06B3/02 (EP);
A61B17/2202 (US);
A61B17/22012 (EP);
B06B1/0261 (EP);
B06B1/0276 (US);
B06B1/0611 (EP);
B06B1/0614 (US);
A61B17/320068 (EP);
A61B2017/00026 (EP);
A61B2017/0003 (EP);
A61B2017/00137 (EP);
A61B2017/00172 (EP);
A61B2017/00176 (EP);
A61B2017/00778 (US);
A61B2017/22014 (EP);
A61B2017/22039 (EP);
A61B2017/320098 (EP);
A61M37/0092 (EP);
B06B2201/76 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR STEUERUNG EINES THERAPEUTISCHEN INTERVENTIONELLEN ULTRASCHALLSYSTEMS | [2024/01] | English: | METHOD FOR CONTROLLING A THERAPEUTIC ULTRASONIC INTERVENTIONAL SYSTEM | [2024/01] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE D'UN SYSTÈME D'INTERVENTION À ULTRASONS THÉRAPEUTIQUE | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 29.02.2024 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   29.04.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2014316269 (ZHANG JIMIN [US], et al); | [YA]US2016361573 (BARTHE PETER G [US], et al); | [Y]US2019105508 (TOMASELLO ANTHONY J [US], et al); | [Y]US2019216487 (NITA HENRY [US], et al); | [XYA]US2019274717 (NOTT CAMERON R [US], et al); | [Y]US2020368407 (ASKEM BEN ALAN [GB], et al) |