EP4297581 - COMPOSITIONS FOR PREPARING ANIMAL-FREE EGG-LIKE PRODUCTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | 27.04.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Clara Foods Co. 2001 Junipero Serra Blvd. 9th Floor Daly City, CA 94014 / US | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MAHADEVAN, Kritika Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 02 /
ZHONG, Ying Joy Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 03 /
JOSHI, Isha Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 04 /
AYOUGHI, Farnoosh Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 05 /
PATNAIK, Ranjan Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 06 /
POTTINGER, A. Samuel Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 07 /
JACOBSON, Dane Mathias Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 08 /
MIYASHIRO, Andrew Daly City, CA 94014 / US | 09 /
KSHIRSAGAR, Harshal Daly City, CA 94014 / US | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22760358.6 | 23.02.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022US17580 | Priority number, date | US202163152489P | 23.02.2021 Original published format: US 202163152489 P | [2024/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022182799 | Date: | 01.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/35] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4297581 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | AU | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A23J1/18, A23J3/20, A23L15/00, C07K14/465, C07K14/77, C12N15/81 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
C12N15/815 (EP,AU,KR);
A23J1/18 (AU,KR,US);
A23J3/14 (EP,KR);
A23L15/35 (EP,AU,KR,US);
A23J1/14 (EP,KR,US);
A23J3/20 (AU,KR);
C07K14/465 (EP,AU,KR,US);
C07K14/77 (EP,AU,KR,US);
C12Y101/03013 (EP,KR);
A23V2002/00 (AU,KR,US);
A23V2200/122 (KR);
A23V2200/15 (KR);
A23V2200/228 (KR);
A23V2250/18 (KR);
A23V2250/242 (KR);
| C-Set: |
A23V2002/00, A23V2200/122, A23V2250/546, A23V2200/228, A23V2200/242, A23V2200/15, A23V2250/18 (AU)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON TIERFREIEN EIARTIGEN PRODUKTEN | [2024/01] | English: | COMPOSITIONS FOR PREPARING ANIMAL-FREE EGG-LIKE PRODUCTS | [2024/01] | French: | COMPOSITIONS POUR LA PRÉPARATION DE PRODUITS D'ORIGINE NON-ANIMALE SIMILAIRES À L'OEUF | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 30.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 30.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.08.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2018084814 (CHALLAKERE KEDAR [US]); | [A]WO2019144044 (PANDO NUTRITION INC [US]); | [A]WO2020041483 (CLARA FOODS CO [US]); | [XY]US2020138066 (ANCHEL DAVID [US]); | [XY]US2021007384 (MAHADEVAN KRITIKA [US], et al); |