EP4377497 - METHOD FOR THE SELECTIVE CATALYTIC HYDROGENATION OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS, AND ELECTRODE AND ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL FOR SAID METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 08.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.10.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | 03.10.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 06.11.2024 [2024/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Fraunhofer-Gesellschaft zur Förderung der angewandten Forschung e.V. Hansastraße 27c 80686 München / DE | For all designated states Ruhr-Universität Bochum Universitätsstrasse 150 44801 Bochum / DE | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SIEGMUND, Daniel 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 02 /
APFEL, Ulf-Peter 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 03 /
JUNGE PURING, Kai 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 04 /
PELLUMBI, Kevinjeorjios 46047 Oberhausen / DE | 05 /
KLEINHAUS, Julian Tobias 44869 Bochum / DE | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22761071.4 | 28.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022EP71292 | Priority number, date | DE202110119761 | 29.07.2021 Original published format: DE102021119761 | [2024/23] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2023006930 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/05] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4377497 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 30.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C25B3/07, C25B3/25, C25B11/031, C25B11/042, C25B11/052, C25B11/077 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
C25B3/07 (EP,KR);
C25B11/031 (EP,KR);
C25B11/042 (EP,KR);
C25B11/052 (EP,KR);
C25B11/077 (EP,KR);
C25B3/25 (EP,KR)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR SELEKTIVEN KATALYTISCHEN HYDRIERUNG ORGANISCHER VERBINDUNGEN SOWIE ELEKTRODE UND ELEKTROCHEMISCHE ZELLE FÜR DIESES VERFAHREN | [2024/23] | English: | METHOD FOR THE SELECTIVE CATALYTIC HYDROGENATION OF ORGANIC COMPOUNDS, AND ELECTRODE AND ELECTROCHEMICAL CELL FOR SAID METHOD | [2024/23] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'HYDROGÉNATION CATALYTIQUE SÉLECTIVE DE COMPOSÉS ORGANIQUES, ÉLECTRODE ET CELLULE ÉLECTROCHIMIQUE POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DE CE PROCÉDÉ | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 15.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 15.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 15.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 11.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Request for further processing for: | 11.09.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 11.09.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XI]US2018222767 (REN SHENQIANG [US], et al); | [XDYI]US2019276941 (SCHMID BERNHARD [DE], et al); | [YD]WO2020169806 (TRIBOTECC GMBH [AT], et al); | [XY]WO2020198578 (UNIV MICHIGAN STATE [US]); | [XY]CN113058621 (DALIAN INST CHEM & PHYSICS CAS); | by applicant | US2014110268 | US2015008139 | US2019276941 | WO2020169806 |