EP4384070 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MITIGATION OF RANDOM BODY MOVEMENT AND INTERFERENCE EFFECTS IN RADAR-BASED VITAL SIGNS MONITORING SYSTEMS IN MEDICAL APPLICATIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 17.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | 17.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 17.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 19.06.2024 [2024/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IEE International Electronics & Engineering S.A. Zone Industrielle 12, rue Pierre Richardot 6468 Echternach / LU | For all designated states Université du Luxembourg 162 A, Avenue de la Faïencerie 1511 Luxembourg / LU | [2024/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TEDGUE BELTRAO, Gabriel 4408 Belvaux / LU | 02 /
SCHRÖDER, Udo 54343 Föhren / DE | 03 /
TATARINOV, Dimitri 54296 Trier / DE | 04 /
ALVES MARTINS, Wallace 7762 Bissen / LU | 05 /
ALAEEKERAHROODI, Mohammad Luxembourg / LU | 06 /
MYSORE RAMA RAO, Bhavani Shankar 1713 Luxembourg / LU | [2024/25] | Representative(s) | Office Freylinger P.O. Box 48 8001 Strassen / LU | [2024/25] | Application number, filing date | 22762037.4 | 05.08.2022 | [2024/25] | WO2022EP72155 | Priority number, date | LU20210500519 | 09.08.2021 Original published format: LU 500519 | LU20210500923 | 29.11.2021 Original published format: LU 500923 | [2024/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023016948 | Date: | 16.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/07] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4384070 | Date: | 19.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 16.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/024, A61B5/0507, A61B5/113, A61B5/00 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
A61B5/0507 (EP);
A61B5/024 (EP);
A61B5/113 (EP);
A61B5/7207 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/25] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR ABSCHWÄCHUNG VON ZUFÄLLIGEN KÖRPERBEWEGUNGS- UND INTERFERENZEFFEKTEN IN RADARBASIERTEN VITALPARAMETERÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEMEN IN MEDIZINISCHEN ANWENDUNGEN | [2024/25] | English: | SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR MITIGATION OF RANDOM BODY MOVEMENT AND INTERFERENCE EFFECTS IN RADAR-BASED VITAL SIGNS MONITORING SYSTEMS IN MEDICAL APPLICATIONS | [2024/25] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ D'ATTÉNUATION D'EFFETS DE MOUVEMENT DE CORPS ALÉATOIRE ET D'INTERFÉRENCE DANS DES SYSTÈMES DE SURVEILLANCE DE SIGNES VITAUX DANS DES APPLICATIONS MÉDICALES | [2024/25] | Entry into regional phase | 04.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 04.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/25] | 04.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016354038 (DEMIRTAS SEFA [US], et al); | by applicant | US8814805 | US9924906 | US10506981 | US10966663 |