EP4302754 - STABLE DOCETAXEL ALBUMIN NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | 10.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 12.06.2024 [2024/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CSPC Zhongqi Pharmaceutical Technology (Shijiazhuang) Co., Ltd. No. 896, Zhongshan East Road High-tech Zone Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LI, Chunlei Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Xiaojun Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 03 /
ZHAO, Yuanyuan Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 04 /
CHEN, Dongjian Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 05 /
LIANG, Min Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 06 /
XING, Qianbin Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 07 /
LI, Nan Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | 08 /
SHU, Yun Shijiazhuang, Hebei 050035 / CN | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22762626.4 | 04.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022CN79286 | Priority number, date | CN202110243298 | 05.03.2021 Original published format: CN202110243298 | [2024/02] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022184164 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | ZH | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4302754 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 09.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61K9/14, A61K9/19, A61K9/16, A61K31/337, A61P35/00 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
A61P35/00 (EP,CN,KR);
A61K9/19 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K31/337 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K47/42 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/0019 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A61K9/10 (EP,CN,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | STABILE DOCETAXEL-ALBUMIN-NANOPARTIKELZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/02] | English: | STABLE DOCETAXEL ALBUMIN NANOPARTICLE COMPOSITION | [2024/02] | French: | COMPOSITION DE NANOPARTICULES D'ALBUMINE ET DE DOCÉTAXEL STABLE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 05.09.2023 | Translation filed | 05.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 05.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]CN1448132 (ACS DOBFAR SPA [IT]) [Y] 1-20 * see description, page 4, paragraphs 2-6 *; | [Y]US2005282734 (KADIMA TENSHUK A [CA], et al) [Y] 1-20 * see description, paragraphs 248-334 *; | [XY]CN101361731 (WENFANG ZHANG [CN]) [X] 1-16, 19-20 * see embodiment 1, and description, page 2, paragraphs 1-2 * [Y] 3, 11, 14, 17-20; | [A]CN102988996 (UNIV TSINGHUA) [A] 1-21* see claims 1-7 *; | [Y]CN103202812 (NANJING UNIVERSITY OF TECHNOLOGY , et al) [Y] 1-20 * see claims 1-23 *; | [Y]CN104434808 (CSPC ZHONGQI PHARMACEUTICAL TECHNOLOGY SHIJIAZHUAN) [Y] 1-20 * see embodiment 34, and description, paragraph 31 *; | [Y]CN106420665 (ZHEJIANG ACADEMY FORESTRY) [Y] 1-20 * see claims 1-7 *; | [XY] - Harm, S., Claudia Schildbock, Jens Hartmann, "Removal of stabilizers from human serum albumin by adsorbents and dialysis used in blood purification,", Plos One, (20180124), vol. 13, no. 1, XP055963033 [X] 21 * see page 1, paragraph 1 to page 2, paragraph 2, page 3, paragraph 4, page 5, paragraph 2, and page 15, paragraph 1 * [Y] 3, 11, 14, 17-20 | by applicant | US2005004002 | CN103054798 | CN106137969 | WO2018059304 | - SA-WON LEEMIN-HYUK YUNSEUNG WEI JEONG, "Development of docetaxel-loaded intravenous formulation, Nanoxel-PMTM using polymer-based delivery system", Journal of Controlled Release, (20110000), vol. 155, doi:10.1016/j.jconrel.2011.06.012, pages 262 - 271, XP028315154 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jconrel.2011.06.012 | - MICHAEL DOCKALDANIEL C. CARTERFLORIAN RUKER, "Conformational Transitions of the Three Recombinant Domains of Human Serum Albumin Depending on pH", J Biol Chem, (20000000), vol. 275, no. 5, doi:10.1074/jbc.275.5.3042, pages 3042 - 3050, XP055342831 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1074/jbc.275.5.3042 | - Chinese Pharmacopoeia, (20200000), vol. IV, page 3111 |