EP4226176 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 14.07.2023 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 09.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
NG, Loong Boon Mountain View, California 94043 / US | 02 /
ZHANG, Jianzhong Mountain View, California 94043 / US | [2023/33] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/33] | Application number, filing date | 22763571.1 | 02.03.2022 | [2023/33] | WO2022KR02914 | Priority number, date | US202163155593P | 02.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155593 P | US202217652892 | 28.02.2022 Original published format: US202217652892 | [2023/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022186589 | Date: | 09.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/36] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4226176 | Date: | 16.08.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 09.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 27.02.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/02, G01S19/01, H04W4/029, H04W4/02, H04W4/80 | [2023/33] | CPC: |
H04W64/00 (EP,US);
H04W4/33 (US);
G01S5/01 (EP);
G01S5/0205 (EP);
G01S5/0258 (EP);
G01S5/0263 (EP);
G01S5/14 (EP);
G01S13/765 (EP);
G01S19/46 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR POSITIONIERUNG EINES SYSTEMS MIT MEHREREN FUNKZUGANGSTECHNOLOGIEN | [2023/33] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR POSITIONING SYSTEM WITH MULTIPLE RADIO ACCESS TECHNOLOGIES | [2023/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE POSITIONNEMENT DE SYSTÈME AVEC DE MULTIPLES TECHNOLOGIES D'ACCÈS RADIO | [2023/33] | Entry into regional phase | 12.05.2023 | National basic fee paid | 12.05.2023 | Search fee paid | 12.05.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 12.05.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.05.2023 | Examination requested [2023/33] | 27.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]CN106646353 (SIMUTECH INC) [Y] 3-7,10-14 * paragraphs [0067] - [0071] *; | [E]WO2022046478 (CISCO TECH INC [US]) [E] 1-15 * paragraphs [0065] - [0071] *; | [XY] - SEONG JU-HYEON ET AL, "High-Speed Positioning and Automatic Updating Technique Using Wi-Fi and UWB in a Ship", WIRELESS PERSONAL COMMUNICATIONS, SPRINGER, DORDRECHT, NL, vol. 94, no. 3, doi:10.1007/S11277-016-3673-2, ISSN 0929-6212, (20160903), pages 1105 - 1121, (20160903), XP036239935 [X] 1,2,8,9,15 * Sections 2.2 and 3 * * figure 5 * [Y] 3-7,10-14 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11277-016-3673-2 | [A] - BARGSHADY NADER ET AL, "Hybrid WiFi/UWB, cooperative localization using Particle Filter", 2015 INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON COMPUTING, NETWORKING AND COMMUNICATIONS (ICNC), IEEE, (20150216), doi:10.1109/ICCNC.2015.7069494, pages 1055 - 1060, XP032752546 [A] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICCNC.2015.7069494 | International search | [A]KR100819392B (DAEGU GYEONGBUK INST SCIENCE [KR], et al) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-5 and figures 1-6 *; | [Y]US2011013569 (SCHERZER SHIMON [US], et al) [Y] 2-4,9-11 * claims 1, 26 *; | [A]CN105891867 (UNIV WUHAN) [A] 1-15* claims 1-4 and figures 1-2 *; | [XY]CN106646353 (SIMUTECH INC) [X] 1,5-8,12-15 * claims 1-6 and figures 1-4 * [Y] 2-4,9-11; | [A]CN111031472 (YANGZHOU HOUCHAO TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-15 * claims 1-8 and figures 1-4 * |