EP4377891 - DETERMINING MINIMUM REGION FOR FINDING PLANAR SURFACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.05.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 13.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.05.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | 03.05.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.05.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 05.06.2024 [2024/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [2024/23] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
COLLARD, Corey, J. Plano, TX 75075 / US | 02 /
VERRET, Jody, D. Rockwall, TX 75087 / US | 03 /
LANDRY, Joseph, C. Dallas, TX 75238 / US | [2024/23] | Representative(s) | Dentons UK and Middle East LLP One Fleet Place London EC4M 7WS / GB | [2024/23] | Application number, filing date | 22764926.6 | 26.07.2022 | [2024/23] | WO2022US38322 | Priority number, date | US202117443713 | 27.07.2021 Original published format: US202117443713 | [2024/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023009508 | Date: | 02.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/05] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4377891 | Date: | 05.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/60 | [2024/23] | CPC: |
G06T7/60 (EP,US);
G06T17/05 (US);
G06T7/11 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/10032 (EP);
G06T2207/20021 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/23] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNG DES MINIMALEN BEREICHS ZUM AUFFINDEN VON EBENEN OBERFLÄCHEN | [2024/23] | English: | DETERMINING MINIMUM REGION FOR FINDING PLANAR SURFACES | [2024/23] | French: | DÉTERMINATION D'UNE RÉGION MINIMALE POUR LA DÉCOUVERTE DE SURFACES PLANES | [2024/23] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/23] | 06.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |