EP4387470 - DE-FLAVORED LEGUME FLOURS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 24.02.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 16.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CORN Products Development Inc. 5 Westbrook Corporate Center Westchester, IL 60154 / US | For all designated states Ingredion Plant Based Protein Specialties (Canada), Inc. 250 Howe Street, 20th Floor Vancouver, British Columbia V6C3R8 / CA | [2024/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANDERSON, Lauren Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 02 /
BENDER, Sharon Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 03 /
COUTROS-HOFFMANN, Stella Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 04 /
DAR, Yadunandan Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 05 /
JEGEDE, Oyelayo Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 06 /
WELCHOFF, Marjorie Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 07 /
MURTHY, Vishnu Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 08 /
O'CONNELL, Xavier Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 09 /
OZER, Canan Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 10 /
SHAH, Tushar Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 11 /
SHARIFF, Roxanna Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 12 /
SKORGE, Robert Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 13 /
SONG, Delong Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | 14 /
XUE, Meng Bridgewater, New Jersey 08807 / US | [2024/26] | Representative(s) | Freudenberger, Hendrik Roland Ingredion Germany GmbH Grüner Deich 110 20097 Hamburg / DE | [2024/26] | Application number, filing date | 22765675.8 | 16.08.2022 | [2024/26] | WO2022US40453 | Priority number, date | US202163235191P | 20.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163235191 P | [2024/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023023046 | Date: | 23.02.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4387470 | Date: | 26.06.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.02.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 23.02.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A23L11/00, A23L11/30, A21D2/36, A21D13/045, A21D13/064, A21D13/066 | [2024/26] | CPC: |
A23L11/05 (EP);
A21D13/045 (EP);
A21D13/064 (EP);
A21D13/066 (EP);
A21D2/362 (EP);
A23L11/31 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/26] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BEINUMMEHLE MIT VERRINGERTEM GESCHMACK UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2024/26] | English: | DE-FLAVORED LEGUME FLOURS AND METHODS OF MANUFACTURE | [2024/26] | French: | FARINES DE LÉGUMINEUSES DÉSAROMATISÉES ET PROCÉDÉS DE FABRICATION | [2024/26] | Entry into regional phase | 06.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 06.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 06.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 06.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/26] | 06.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]US4022919 (COMER FREDERICK WILLIAM); | [XY]US2007160728 (RUDIE NOEL [US], et al); | [XYI]WO2016120234 (AMBIENTE E NUTRIZIONE SRL [IT]); | [Y]US2019000120 (HOSSEN MONJUR [US], et al); | by applicant | US5378434 |