EP4392490 - IRRADIATION-CURABLE SILICONE COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 31.05.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 20.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Momentive Performance Materials GmbH Chemiepark Leverkusen Gebäude V7 51368 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
DE SANTIS, Cristian 47259 Duisburg / DE | 02 /
RUPPENTHAL, Andrea 51373 Leverkusen / DE | [2024/27] | Representative(s) | Gille Hrabal Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Patentanwälte Brucknerstraße 20 40593 Düsseldorf / DE | [2024/27] | Application number, filing date | 22768769.6 | 23.08.2022 | [2024/27] | WO2022EP73469 | Priority number, date | US202163236473P | 24.08.2021 Original published format: US 202163236473 P | [2024/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023025792 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4392490 | Date: | 03.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C08L83/04 | [2024/27] | CPC: |
C08L83/04 (EP,KR);
C08G77/12 (EP,KR);
C08G77/20 (EP,KR);
C08L83/00 (KR);
H01L23/296 (EP,KR);
H01L33/56 (EP,KR)
| C-Set: |
C08L83/04, C08L83/00, C08L83/00, C08K5/56 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/27] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | DURCH STRAHLUNG HÄRTBARE SILIKONZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2024/27] | English: | IRRADIATION-CURABLE SILICONE COMPOSITION | [2024/27] | French: | COMPOSITION DE SILICONE DURCISSABLE PAR IRRADIATION | [2024/27] | Entry into regional phase | 26.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/27] | 26.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [I]CN113166546 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD); | US2022340756 [ ] (NISHIJIMA KAZUHIRO [JP], et al) | by applicant | US3159601 | US3159662 | US3419593 | US3715334 | US3775452 | US3814730 | EP0122008 | US4510094 | EP0146307 | US4530879 | US4640939 | US2003199603 | EP1672031 | US9991406 | US2018314352 | WO2018208348 |