EP4341522 - DRIVER ELEMENT FOR A VEHICLE WINDOW LIFTER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.02.2024 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Brose Fahrzeugteile SE & Co. Kommanditgesellschaft, Bamberg Berliner Ring 1 96052 Bamberg / DE | [2024/13] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAUBMANN, Udo 96476 Bad Rodach / DE | 02 /
MALHERBE, Laurent 96049 Bamberg / DE | [2024/13] | Representative(s) | FDST Patentanwälte Nordostpark 16 90411 Nürnberg / DE | [2024/13] | Application number, filing date | 22769572.3 | 22.08.2022 | [2024/13] | WO2022EP73278 | Priority number, date | DE202110209238 | 23.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021209238 | [2024/13] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023025704 | Date: | 02.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4341522 | Date: | 27.03.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 02.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/13] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 02.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E05F11/38 | [2024/13] | CPC: |
E05F11/385 (EP);
E05D15/165 (US);
B60J1/17 (US);
E05F15/6909 (US);
E05F2011/387 (EP);
E05Y2201/684 (US);
E05Y2600/502 (EP,US);
E05Y2600/56 (EP);
E05Y2600/632 (US);
E05Y2900/55 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/13] | Title | German: | MITNEHMER FÜR EINEN FAHRZEUGFENSTERHEBER | [2024/13] | English: | DRIVER ELEMENT FOR A VEHICLE WINDOW LIFTER | [2024/13] | French: | ENTRAÎNEUR POUR LÈVE-VITRE DE VÉHICULE | [2024/13] | Entry into regional phase | 19.12.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.12.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.12.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.12.2023 | Examination requested [2024/13] | 19.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XY]DE102004034144 (KUESTER AUTOMOTIVE DOOR SYS [DE]); | [XAI]DE102019131998 (MAGNA CLOSURES INC [CA]); | [IAY]WO2021160460 (BROSE FAHRZEUGTEILE SE & CO KG BAMBERG [DE]) |