EP4395618 - SETTING A POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE WORKING MEMBER IN A NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Versuni Holding B.V. High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
STEEMAN, Jonne 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Vollering, Stefanus Franciscus Maria Philips Domestic Appliances IP Department High Tech Campus 42 5656 AE Eindhoven / NL | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22769647.3 | 26.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022EP73844 | Priority number, date | EP20210194418 | 01.09.2021 Original published format: EP 21194418 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023031059 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395618 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A47L9/04, A47L9/06 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
A47L9/0477 (EP);
A47L9/066 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | EINSTELLEN EINER POSITION VON MINDESTENS EINEM ARBEITSELEMENT IN EINER DÜSENANORDNUNG | [2024/28] | English: | SETTING A POSITION OF AT LEAST ONE WORKING MEMBER IN A NOZZLE ARRANGEMENT | [2024/28] | French: | RÉGLAGE D'UNE POSITION D'AU MOINS UN ÉLÉMENT DE TRAVAIL DANS UN AGENCEMENT DE BUSES | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 02.04.2024 | National basic fee paid | 02.04.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.04.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 02.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [AD]US3798704 (KILSTROM L, et al); | [A]US4447931 (LINDQVIST LENNART S A [SE]); | [A]WO2013027140 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) | by applicant | US3798704 |