EP4309193 - TELECOMMUNICATION CABLE WITH TAPE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.12.2023 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sterlite Technologies Limited 15th & 16th Floor Capital Cyberscape,Sector 59 Gurugram, Haryana 122102 / IN | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | For all designated states Sterlite Technologies Limited 15th & 16th Floor Capital Cyberscape,Sector 59 Gurugram 122102 Haryana / IN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BHATT, Darshana Gurugram, Haryana 122002 / IN | 02 /
KUMAR, Sujeet Gurugram, Haryana 122002 / IN | [2024/04] | Representative(s) | Valet Patent Services Limited c/o Caya 83713X Am Börstig 5 96052 Bamberg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2024/04] | Valet Patent Services Limited Landsberger Straße 302 80687 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 22770779.1 | 14.03.2022 | [2024/04] | WO2022IN50235 | Priority number, date | IN202111011037 | 16.03.2021 Original published format: IN202111011037 | [2024/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022195613 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4309193 | Date: | 24.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/04] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IN | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01B11/02, H01B11/06, H01B13/22 | [2024/04] | CPC: |
H01B11/06 (EP);
H01B11/1041 (US);
H01B11/002 (US);
H01B11/02 (EP);
H01B13/22 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/04] | Title | German: | FERNMELDEKABEL MIT BAND | [2024/04] | English: | TELECOMMUNICATION CABLE WITH TAPE | [2024/04] | French: | CÂBLE DE TÉLÉCOMMUNICATION AVEC BANDE | [2024/04] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2023 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2023 | Examination requested [2024/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2017213621 (CORNELISON KENNETH E [US], et al) [X] 1-12 * [Abstract, paragraphs [0023], [0041], [0075]-[0161], claims 1-21, figures 1-24] *; | [A]EP3309799 (BELDEN INC [US]) [A] 1-12* [Abstract, paragraphs [0007]-[0016], [0020]-[0062], claims 1-17, figures 1-3] * |