EP4266562 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STATOR FOR ROTARY ELECTRIC MACHINE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.09.2023 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2023/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ONO, Hiroyuki Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | [2023/43] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2023/43] | Application number, filing date | 22771564.6 | 18.03.2022 | [2023/43] | WO2022JP12872 | Priority number, date | JP20210045433 | 19.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021045433 | [2023/43] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022196822 | Date: | 22.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/38] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4266562 | Date: | 25.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 22.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | B23K26/21, B23K9/167, B23K26/32, B23K9/23, B23K26/0622, B23K26/22, H02K15/00, H02K3/12, B23K9/00, // B23K101/36, B23K101/38, B23K103/10, B23K103/12, B23K103/08 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
B23K9/0026 (EP);
H02K15/0068 (US);
B23K26/0622 (EP);
B23K26/21 (US);
B23K26/22 (EP);
B23K26/32 (EP);
B23K9/167 (EP);
B23K9/23 (EP);
H02K15/0081 (EP);
H02K15/02 (US);
H02K15/0414 (US);
H02K3/12 (EP);
B23K2101/36 (EP,US);
B23K2101/38 (EP);
B23K2103/08 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2023/43] | H02K15/04, H02K15/085, B23K26/21 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/43] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES STATORS FÜR EINE ELEKTRISCHE DREHMASCHINE | [2023/43] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING STATOR FOR ROTARY ELECTRIC MACHINE | [2023/43] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE STATOR POUR MACHINE ÉLECTRIQUE ROTATIVE | [2023/43] | Entry into regional phase | 18.07.2023 | Translation filed | 18.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012319522 (IKEDA KAZUMASA [JP]); | [A]WO2018072163 (GM GLOBAL TECH OPERATIONS LLC [US], et al); | [Y]JP2019134539 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | International search | [Y]JP2018020340 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2020054155 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [Y]JP2020055024 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al); | [A]JP2021010947 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | by applicant | JP2018020340 |