EP4395961 - GRINDING DISC FOR A GRINDING DEVICE AND GRINDING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 26.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TTS Microcell GmbH Hamburger Straße 20 49124 Georgsmarienhütte / DE | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HABERER, Markus 49186 Bad Iburg / DE | 02 /
SIEBERT, Frank 49143 Bissendorf / DE | 03 /
IRMLER, Michael 49086 Osnabrück / DE | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Patentanwälte Magenbauer & Kollegen Partnerschaft mbB Plochinger Straße 109 73730 Esslingen / DE | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22772427.5 | 24.08.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022EP73614 | Priority number, date | DE202110209532 | 31.08.2021 Original published format: DE102021209532 | [2024/28] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023030999 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | DE | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4395961 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | DE | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B24B55/10, B24D9/08, B24D7/10 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
B24B55/102 (EP);
B24D7/10 (EP);
B24D9/08 (EP);
B24B23/028 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | SCHLEIFTELLER FÜR EIN SCHLEIFGERÄT UND SCHLEIFSYSTEM | [2024/28] | English: | GRINDING DISC FOR A GRINDING DEVICE AND GRINDING SYSTEM | [2024/28] | French: | DISQUE DE BROYAGE POUR UN DISPOSITIF DE BROYAGE ET SYSTÈME DE BROYAGE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.02.2024 | National basic fee paid | 29.02.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.02.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.02.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 29.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [XA]DE8902423U ; | [XAI]CN2701589Y (CHEN XINYU [CN]); | [XAI]EP3187305 (FESTOOL GMBH [DE]); | [XA]DE202019100386U (BRUTEX IND INC [TW], et al) | by applicant | EP3187305 |