EP4262057 - STATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.09.2023 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AISIN CORPORATION 2-1, Asahi-machi Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | For all designated states TOYOTA JIDOSHA KABUSHIKI KAISHA 1, Toyota-cho Toyota-shi Aichi 471-8571 / JP | For all designated states DENSO CORPORATION 1-1, Showa-cho Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | [2023/42] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUGIYAMA, Toshiya Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 02 /
TAKAHASHI, Munehiro Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 03 /
KIMURA, Keisuke Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8650 / JP | 04 /
TAKEDA, Ken Kariya-shi, Aichi 448-8661 / JP | 05 /
NOZAWA, Takahito Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 06 /
MATSUMOTO, Takashi Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 07 /
YAMAGISHI, Yoshitada Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 08 /
KITAGAWA, Katsuhide Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | 09 /
KATO, Hajime Toyota-shi, Aichi 471-8571 / JP | [2023/42] | Representative(s) | Kramer Barske Schmidtchen Patentanwälte PartG mbB European Patent Attorneys Landsberger Strasse 300 80687 München / DE | [2023/42] | Application number, filing date | 22774680.7 | 01.02.2022 | [2023/42] | WO2022JP03826 | Priority number, date | JP20210050767 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021050767 | [2023/42] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022201878 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4262057 | Date: | 18.10.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H02K3/04, H02K3/38, H02K3/50 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
H02K3/50 (EP,US);
H02K1/182 (US);
H02K1/16 (US);
H02K2201/03 (US);
H02K2213/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/42] | Title | German: | STATOR | [2023/42] | English: | STATOR | [2023/42] | French: | STATOR | [2023/42] | Entry into regional phase | 14.07.2023 | Translation filed | 14.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 14.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 14.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US9325213 (EGAMI KENICHI [JP]); | [X]US2018278113 (ASAHI ATSUSHI [JP], et al); | [A]WO2020195127 (DENSO CORP [JP]) | International search | [A]JP2010233327 (MITSUBA CORP); | [A]JP2015156754 (NSK LTD); | [A]JP2016019420 (KYB CORP, et al); | [A]US2016380522 (WOO SHUNGHUN [KR], et al); | [A]JP2019068494 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP); | [A]JP2019140821 (TOYOTA MOTOR CORP, et al) | by applicant | JP2019068494 |