EP4220342 - ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 30.06.2023 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.08.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Samsung Electronics Co., Ltd. 129, Samsung-ro Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IVANOV, Igor Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 02 /
HWANG, Seonho Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 03 /
YEO, Hyungsok Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 04 /
FEYGENSON, Oleg Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 05 /
YOO, Minwoo Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | 06 /
HEO, Changryong Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16677 / KR | [2023/31] | Representative(s) | Gulde & Partner Patent- und Rechtsanwaltskanzlei mbB Wallstraße 58/59 10179 Berlin / DE | [2023/31] | Application number, filing date | 22775935.4 | 03.03.2022 | [2023/31] | WO2022KR03031 | Priority number, date | KR20210037952 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: KR 20210037952 | [2023/31] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022203233 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | KO | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4220342 | Date: | 02.08.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G06F1/16, G09F9/30 | [2023/31] | CPC: |
G06F1/1652 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/16 (EP);
G06F1/1615 (EP,US);
G06F1/1637 (EP);
G06F1/1647 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/1675 (EP,US);
G06F1/1681 (KR);
G09F9/30 (EP);
G09F9/301 (KR);
G06F2203/04102 (KR)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/31] | Title | German: | ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG MIT FLEXIBLER ANZEIGE | [2023/31] | English: | ELECTRONIC DEVICE COMPRISING FLEXIBLE DISPLAY | [2023/31] | French: | DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE COMPRENANT UN AFFICHAGE SOUPLE | [2023/31] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2023 | Translation filed | 26.04.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2023 | Examination requested [2023/31] | 27.08.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.08.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2004070633 (NAKAMURA TETSUROH [JP], et al); | [I]US2005200559 (KOYAMA FUMIO [JP], et al); | [A]KR20050109613 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]); | [I]JP2007298653 (KONICA MINOLTA HOLDINGS INC); | [A]JP2009008955 (RICOH KK); | [I]KR20160003524 (UNIV YEUNGNAM IACF [KR]); | [A]KR20170013540 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]); | [I]US2017364220 (KARL CHRISTIAN [US], et al); | [A]KR20180015225 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]); | [A]CN111045484 (CAO LEI) | International search | [Y]KR20050109613 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0024] and [0033]-[0036]; and figures 1-2, 4-6 and 8. *; | [Y]JP2009008955 (RICOH KK) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0006] and [0015]; and figures 1-2 and 9. *; | [A]KR20170013540 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [A] 1-15* See paragraphs [0057]-[0065]; and figures 8-9. *; | [Y]KR20180015225 (3M INNOVATIVE PROPERTIES CO [US]) [Y] 1-15 * See paragraphs [0012] and [0023]; claim 1; and figure 2g. *; | [Y]CN111045484 (CAO LEI) [Y] 13-15 * See paragraph [0024]; and figures 1 and 4-6. * |