EP4302350 - LIQUID CARBON-NEUTRAL ENERGY FACILITY SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.12.2023 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change - priority | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Claire Technologies Corporation 4115 Blackhawk Plaza Circle, Suite 100 Danville, CA 94506 / US | [2024/02] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KLAASSEN, Alan, W. Kensington, CA 95708 / US | 02 /
MUNSON, Curtis, L. Oakland, CA 94602 / US | 03 /
SCIAMANNA, Steven, F. Orinda, CA 84563 / US | 04 /
ALLINSON, Paul, A. Danville, CA 94506 / US | [2024/02] | Representative(s) | Flügel Preissner Schober Seidel Patentanwälte PartG mbB Nymphenburger Straße 20 80335 München / DE | [2024/02] | Application number, filing date | 22776298.6 | 01.03.2022 | [2024/02] | WO2022US18362 | Priority number, date | US202163155741P | 03.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163155741 P | WO2021US52553 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: PCT/US2021/052553 | US202117488867 | 29.09.2021 Original published format: US202117488867 | US202117497903 | 09.10.2021 Original published format: US202117497903 | WO2021US54323 | 09.10.2021 Original published format: PCT/US2021/054323 | [2024/28] |
Former [2024/02] | US202163155741P | 02.03.2021 | |
WO2021US52553 | 29.09.2021 | ||
US202117488867 | 29.09.2021 | ||
US202117497903 | 09.10.2021 | ||
WO2021US54323 | 09.10.2021 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2022203824 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4302350 | Date: | 10.01.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 22.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M8/0656, H01M8/04186 | [2024/02] | CPC: |
H01M8/0656 (EP,US);
C10G45/00 (US);
H01M8/04022 (EP);
H01M8/04201 (EP,US);
H01M8/0606 (EP);
H01M8/0643 (US);
H01M8/0668 (US);
C10G45/44 (US);
H01M8/0625 (EP);
Y02P30/00 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/02] | Title | German: | ANLAGENSYSTEM ZUR NEUTRALEN ENERGIE VON FLÜSSIGEM KOHLENSTOFF | [2024/02] | English: | LIQUID CARBON-NEUTRAL ENERGY FACILITY SYSTEM | [2024/02] | French: | SYSTÈME D'INSTALLATION D'ÉNERGIE NEUTRE EN CARBONE LIQUIDE | [2024/02] | Entry into regional phase | 02.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 29.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/02] | 28.05.2024 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Priority 0002, 0005 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2008305371 (HERMANN WILLIAM [US], et al) [X] 11-13 * entire document *; | [Y]US2013331616 (OLAH GEORGE A [US], et al) [Y] 3 * entire document *; | [A]US2016289142 (ZUBRIN ROBERT [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018053957 (PEZ GUIDO [US], et al) [Y] 1-5, 8-10 * entire document *; | [XY]US2020094933 (OUCHI KAZUYUKI [JP]) [X] 18, 19 * entire document * [Y] 1-5, 8-10; | [EX]US2022109175 (ALLINSON PAUL A [US], et al) [EX] 1-20 * entire document *; | [EX]US2022285714 (KLAASSEN ALAN W [US], et al) [EX] 1-20* entire document * |