EP4313887 - METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VERTICAL GRADIENT FREEZE 8 INCH GALLIUM ARSENIDE SUBSTRATES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | 24.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 26.06.2024 [2024/26] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Axt, Inc. 4281 Technology Drive Fremont, CA 94538 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Weiguo San Leandro, California 64577 / US | 02 /
SHETTY, Rajaram Niskayuna, New York 12309 / US | 03 /
ZHANG, Wei Fremont, California 94538 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Christian ZSP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Hansastraße 32 80686 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22776441.2 | 22.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US21294 | Priority number, date | US202163164378P | 22.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163164378 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022204106 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4313887 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C03B11/08, C03B11/00, C03B29/06 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
C30B29/42 (EP,US);
C30B11/002 (US);
C30B11/003 (US);
C30B11/006 (EP,US);
H01L21/02395 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND SYSTEM FÜR 8 ZOLL GALLIUMARSENIDSUBSTRATE MIT VERTIKALEM GRADIENTEN-GEFRIERVERFAHREN UND -SYSTEM | [2024/06] | English: | METHOD AND SYSTEM FOR VERTICAL GRADIENT FREEZE 8 INCH GALLIUM ARSENIDE SUBSTRATES | [2024/06] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET SYSTÈME POUR SUBSTRATS D'ARSÉNIURE DE GALLIUM DE 8 POUCES À CONGÉLATION À GRADIENT VERTICAL | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 19.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 19.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 19.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 19.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 08.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2009249994 (LIU WEIGUO [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * ; Figure 1; paragraph [0016]; Claim 1 *; | [Y]US2019085482 (SHINDO ISAMU [JP]) [Y] 4,24* ; Figure 1; paragraphs [0139, 0208-0209] *; | [Y]US2020190697 (SHETTY RAJARAM [US], et al) [Y] 1-30 * ; Entire document * |