EP4277522 - RF RECEIVE COIL CIRCUIT FOR MRI SYSTEMS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.10.2023 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Coilone, LLC 4538 Snelling Avenue N. Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | [2023/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZENG, Li Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | 02 /
ZHENG, David Arden Hills, MN 55112 / US | [2023/47] | Representative(s) | Deambrogi, Edgardo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2023/47] | Application number, filing date | 22776534.4 | 23.03.2022 | [2023/47] | WO2022US21465 | Priority number, date | US202117211534 | 24.03.2021 Original published format: US202117211534 | [2023/47] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022204229 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4277522 | Date: | 22.11.2023 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2023/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.04.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61B5/05, A61B5/055, G01R33/34, G01R33/3415, G01R33/3815, G01R33/36, H03H7/42, H05K1/16 | [2024/21] | CPC: |
G01R33/3621 (EP,KR);
G01R33/3607 (KR,US);
G01R33/3614 (KR,US);
H03H7/38 (KR);
H03H7/42 (EP,KR,US);
H03H7/425 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2023/47] | A61B5/05, A61B5/055, G01R33/34, G01R33/3415, G01R33/3815 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/47] | Title | German: | HF-EMPFANGSSPULENSCHALTUNG FÜR MRI-SYSTEME | [2023/47] | English: | RF RECEIVE COIL CIRCUIT FOR MRI SYSTEMS | [2023/47] | French: | CIRCUIT À BOBINE DE RÉCEPTION RF POUR SYSTÈMES D'IRM | [2023/47] | Entry into regional phase | 11.07.2023 | National basic fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Search fee paid | 11.07.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.07.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.07.2023 | Examination requested [2023/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2012319687 (CHU DASHEN [US], et al); | [A]CN202978839U (SHANGHAI CHENGUANG MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES CO LTD); | [XI]US2013314091 (OTAKE YOSUKE [JP], et al); | [XA]US8791696 (GRAFENDORFER THOMAS [US], et al); | [A]US2017139020 (ZHANG SONGTAO [CN], et al); | International search | [Y]US2009076378 (MISIC GEORGE J [US]); | [XY]US7526330 (RANDELL CHRISTOPHER PAUL [GB], et al); | [Y]US2009289630 (NASCIMENTO GEORGE [US], et al); | [A]US2009310329 (BROWN RICHARD D [US], et al); | [Y]US2012319687 (CHU DASHEN [US], et al); | [A]US2017254864 (OTAKE YOSUKE [JP], et al); | [Y]US2019277926 (STORMONT ROBERT STEVEN [US], et al); | [A]US2019310329 (MALIK NABEEL [US], et al); | [Y]US2019326501 (GILBERT DOUGLAS J [US], et al); | [Y]US2019339344 (MIOSGA MICHAEL [DE], et al); | [A]US2020271739 (ZHU HUABIN [CN]) |