EP4312717 - AXIAL LENGTH MEASUREMENT MONITOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 30.09.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Acucela Inc. 600 University Street, Suite 2900 Seattle, WA 98101-4174 / US | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KUBOTA, Ryo Seattle, Washington 98101-4174 / US | 02 /
BUSCEMI, Philip M. Mount Pleasant, South Carolina 29464 / US | 03 /
PFISTER, Matthias 3097 Liebefeld-Bern / CH | 04 /
WYDER, Stephan 3006 Bern / CH | 05 /
GUPTA, Amitava Roanoke, Virginia 24018 / US | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Clark, Jane Anne, et al Mathys & Squire The Shard 32 London Bridge Street London SE1 9SG / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22776808.2 | 10.01.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022US70125 | Priority number, date | US202163200718P | 24.03.2021 Original published format: US 202163200718 P | [2024/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022204622 | Date: | 29.09.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/39] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4312717 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.09.2022 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 29.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61B3/028, A61B3/10, A61B3/103, A61B3/11 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A61B3/102 (EP,US);
A61B3/103 (EP);
G01B9/02091 (US);
G01B2290/45 (US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | ÜBERWACHUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR AXIALE LÄNGENMESSUNG | [2024/06] | English: | AXIAL LENGTH MEASUREMENT MONITOR | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SURVEILLANCE DE MESURE DE LONGUEUR AXIALE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 26.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 26.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | 19.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2010117386 (DOHENY EYE INST [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * ; See Figs. 1, 23; paragraphs [0290], [0291] *; | [A]US9055892 (NARASIMHA-IYER HARIHAR [US], et al) [A] 1-17* ; See col. 11, lines 53-58 *; | [A]CA3111012 (ZEISS CARL VISION INT GMBH [DE]) [A] 1-17 * ; See Figs. 1, 2, 4; Abstract; page 1, lines 32-35 *; | [A]US10912456 (BRENNAN NOEL A [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * ; See Figs. 1, 2; Abstract * |