EP4397006 - PARALLEL VIDEO CALL AND ARTIFICIAL REALITY SPACES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 07.06.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.03.2023 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 07.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 07.06.2024 | Request for examination filed | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states META PLATFORMS TECHNOLOGIES, LLC 1601 Willow Road Menlo Park, CA 94025 / US | [2024/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEBEAU, Michael James Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 02 /
WANBO, Björn Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 03 /
RESENDE, Fábio Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 04 /
RABKIN, Mark Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | 05 /
RANTANEN, Vesa Petteri Menlo Park, California 94025 / US | [2024/28] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [2024/28] | Application number, filing date | 22777850.3 | 02.09.2022 | [2024/28] | WO2022US42452 | Priority number, date | US202117466528 | 03.09.2021 Original published format: US202117466528 | [2024/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2023034567 | Date: | 09.03.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4397006 | Date: | 10.07.2024 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 09.03.2023 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2024/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.03.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04L12/18 | [2024/28] | CPC: |
H04L12/1818 (EP,US);
H04N7/157 (US);
G06Q10/1093 (US);
H04L12/1822 (US);
H04L12/1827 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | PARALLELE VIDEOANRUF- UND VIRTUAL-REALITY-RÄUME | [2024/28] | English: | PARALLEL VIDEO CALL AND ARTIFICIAL REALITY SPACES | [2024/28] | French: | APPELS VIDÉO PARALLÈLES ET ESPACES DE RÉALITÉ ARTIFICIELLE | [2024/28] | Entry into regional phase | 26.01.2024 | National basic fee paid | 26.01.2024 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.01.2024 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.01.2024 | Examination requested [2024/28] | 26.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US2016026253 (BRADSKI GARY R [US], et al); | [XI]US2017357917 (HOLMES BETSY J [US], et al); | [A]US2018331841 (ROSS DAVID [US], et al) |