EP4275666 - PANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 13.10.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Unicharm Corporation 182 Shimobun Kinsei-cho Shikokuchuo-shi Ehime 799-0111 / JP | [2023/46] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MUKAI, Hirotomo Kanonji-shi, Kagawa 769-1602 / JP | [2023/46] | Representative(s) | Dolleymores 9 Rickmansworth Road Watford, Hertfordshire WD18 0JU / GB | [2023/46] | Application number, filing date | 22780008.3 | 11.03.2022 | [2023/46] | WO2022JP11061 | Priority number, date | JP20210061140 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021061140 | [2023/46] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209787 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4275666 | Date: | 15.11.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.05.2024 | Classification | IPC: | A61F13/496, A61F13/49, A61F13/532, A61F13/535 | [2023/46] | CPC: |
A61F13/496 (EP);
A61F13/49011 (EP);
A61F13/49017 (EP);
A61F13/49019 (EP);
A61F13/49061 (EP);
A61F13/532 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2023/46] | Title | German: | HOSENARTIGER SAUGFÄHIGER ARTIKEL | [2023/46] | English: | PANTS-TYPE ABSORBENT ARTICLE | [2023/46] | French: | ARTICLE ABSORBANT DE TYPE CULOTTE | [2023/46] | Miscellaneous | EPB 2023/46: The applicant has filed a text with which it is intended to bring the translation into conformity with the application as filed (Art. 14(2) EPC) | Entry into regional phase | 09.08.2023 | Translation filed | 09.08.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.08.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.08.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.08.2023 | Examination requested [2023/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP1153585 (UNI CHARM CORP [JP]); | [Y]WO2007074682 (DAIO SEISHI KK [JP], et al); | [Y]EP3646833 (UNICHARM CORP [JP]); | [Y]US10813796 (UMEMOTO KAORI [JP]); | [Y]WO2020241024 (UNICHARM CORP [JP]) | International search | [Y]JP2019030551 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [AY]JP2019118557 (UNI CHARM CORP); | [A]JP2020192123 (UNI CHARM CORP) | by applicant | JP2019030551 |