EP4317706 - FLUID CIRCUIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eagle Industry Co., Ltd. 1-12-15, Shiba-Daimon Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Yoshiyuki Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 02 /
SATO, Koji Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 03 /
OKAMOTO, Yuta Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 04 /
SEKI, Tomoki Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | 05 /
ARIKAWA, Tatsuhiro Tokyo 105-8587 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | WSL Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Kaiser-Friedrich-Ring 98 65185 Wiesbaden / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780188.3 | 17.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP12346 | Priority number, date | JP20210059974 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021059974 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022209969 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4317706 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | F15B11/028, F15B3/00 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
F15B3/00 (EP,US);
F15B15/1476 (US);
F15B11/032 (EP);
F15B15/226 (US);
F15B1/024 (EP);
F15B2211/20523 (EP);
F15B2211/20538 (US);
F15B2211/20546 (EP);
F15B2211/20576 (EP);
F15B2211/214 (EP);
F15B2211/3116 (EP);
F15B2211/329 (EP);
F15B2211/40515 (US);
F15B2211/40584 (EP);
F15B2211/41563 (EP);
F15B2211/4159 (US);
F15B2211/426 (EP);
F15B2211/50518 (EP);
F15B2211/625 (EP);
F15B2211/6306 (EP);
F15B2211/6309 (EP);
F15B2211/6316 (EP);
F15B2211/6355 (EP);
F15B2211/67 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | FLUIDKREISLAUF | [2024/06] | English: | FLUID CIRCUIT | [2024/06] | French: | CIRCUIT DE FLUIDE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 09.10.2023 | Translation filed | 09.10.2023 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Search fee paid | 09.10.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS58102804 (NIHON NUMBER PLATE KK) [Y] 1-7 * page 2, upper left column, line 1 to page 4, lower left column, line 13, fig. 2-5 *; | [Y]JPS58191388U [Y] 3, 5-7; | [Y]JP2014013062 (EAGLE IND CO LTD) [Y] 1-7 * paragraphs [0001]-[0006], [0022]-[0055], fig. 1-4 * | by applicant | JP2011185417 |