EP4316430 - INDWELLING DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.06.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | 07.06.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 10.07.2024 [2024/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SB-Kawasumi Laboratories, Inc. 3-25-4 Tonomachi, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | For all designated states Sumitomo Bakelite Co., Ltd. 5-8, Higashi-Shinagawa 2-chome Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TAMAI, Yusuke Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | 02 /
YAMAMOTO, Naoaki Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | 03 /
EMI, Tomohiro Kawasaki-shi, Kanagawa 210-8602 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | Müller-Boré & Partner Patentanwälte PartG mbB Friedenheimer Brücke 21 80639 München / DE | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780272.5 | 18.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP12884 | Priority number, date | JP20210057476 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021057476 | JP20210059197 | 31.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021059197 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210057 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4316430 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A61F2/966 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
A61F2/966 (EP);
A61F2/9661 (US);
A61F2/9517 (EP,US);
A61F2/07 (EP);
A61F2002/065 (EP);
A61F2002/9665 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | VERWEILVORRICHTUNG | [2024/06] | English: | INDWELLING DEVICE | [2024/06] | French: | DISPOSITIF À DEMEURE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 21.09.2023 | Translation filed | 21.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 21.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.09.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JP2002503114 (ENDOVASCULAR TECHNOLOGIES, INC) [Y] 3-4 * p. 15, lines 17-25 *; | [YAX]JP2020508089 (BOLTON MEDICAL, INC) [Y] 3-4 * paragraphs [0027]-[0029], fig. 9-10 * * paragraphs [0027]-[0029], fig. 9-10 * [A] 5-6 [X] 1-2; | [A]WO2020179697 (KAWASUMI LAB INC [JP]) [A] 1-6* entire text, all drawings * | by applicant | JP5408866B | JP2015107301 | JP2021057476 | JP2021059197 |