EP4318057 - BLACK PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF BLACK PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION, CURED FILM, COLOR FILTER, LIGHT-SHIELDING FILM, OPTICAL ELEMENT, SOLID-STATE IMAGE CAPTURING ELEMENT, AND HEADLIGHT UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.01.2024 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.2024 | Change: Validation states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | 31.05.2024 | Change - extension states | published on 03.07.2024 [2024/27] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJIFILM Corporation 26-30, Nishiazabu 2-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 106-8620 / JP | [2024/06] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ADACHI Misaho Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 02 /
IDEI Hiroaki Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | 03 /
YOKOYAMA Norifumi Haibara-gun, Shizuoka 421-0396 / JP | [2024/06] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2024/06] | Application number, filing date | 22780390.5 | 23.03.2022 | [2024/06] | WO2022JP13566 | Priority number, date | JP20210055075 | 29.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021055075 | JP20210097851 | 11.06.2021 Original published format: JP 2021097851 | [2024/06] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210175 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4318057 | Date: | 07.02.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/06] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G02B5/20, C09B67/20, C09D4/00, C09D7/61, C09D7/62, C09D7/63, G02B5/00, G03F7/004, G03F7/027, H01L27/146 | [2024/06] | CPC: |
H01L27/14623 (EP);
G03F7/0007 (EP,US);
C08F222/04 (EP);
C09B67/006 (EP);
C09D4/00 (EP);
C09D5/008 (EP);
C09D7/41 (EP);
C09D7/61 (EP);
C09D7/62 (EP);
C09D7/63 (EP);
F21S41/40 (US);
G02B27/0018 (EP);
G02B5/003 (EP);
G02B5/201 (EP);
G02B5/208 (EP);
| C-Set: |
C08F222/04, C08F222/106 (EP);
C09D4/00, C08F222/04 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/06] | Title | German: | SCHWARZE LICHTEMPFINDLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN FÜR SCHWARZE LICHTEMPFINDLICHE ZUSAMMENSETZUNG, GEHÄRTETER FILM, FARBFILTER, LICHTABSCHIRMENDER FILM, OPTISCHES ELEMENT, FESTKÖRPERBILDAUFNAHMEELEMENT UND SCHEINWERFEREINHEIT | [2024/06] | English: | BLACK PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION, MANUFACTURING METHOD OF BLACK PHOTOSENSITIVE COMPOSITION, CURED FILM, COLOR FILTER, LIGHT-SHIELDING FILM, OPTICAL ELEMENT, SOLID-STATE IMAGE CAPTURING ELEMENT, AND HEADLIGHT UNIT | [2024/06] | French: | COMPOSITION PHOTOSENSIBLE NOIRE, PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE COMPOSITION PHOTOSENSIBLE NOIRE, FILM DURCI, FILTRE COLORÉ, FILM DE PROTECTION CONTRE LA LUMIÈRE, ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE, ÉLÉMENT DE CAPTURE D'IMAGE À SEMI-CONDUCTEURS ET UNITÉ DE PHARE | [2024/06] | Entry into regional phase | 18.09.2023 | Translation filed | 18.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 18.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 18.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YX]JP2008203841 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [YX]JP2009145884 (MITSUBISHI CHEM CORP); | [Y]WO2020203080 (FUJIFILM CORP [JP]) | by applicant | JPS495432 | JPS57205322 | JPS6065069 | JPS61201610 | JPS621753 | JPS6326784B | JP2000066385 | JP2000080068 | JP2001233611 | JP2001233842 | JP3272111B | JP2004534797 | JP2005258254 | JP2006342166 | JP2007302836 | JP2008250074 | JP2008260927 | WO2008131313 | JP2008266045 | JP2008292970 | JP4223071B | JP2009091205 | JP4328935B | JP2010168539 | JP2010527339 | JP2010534726 | JP2010262028 | WO2011049090 | JP2011089090 | JP2011524436 | JP2011233983 | JP2012003225 | JP2012014052 | US2012037789 | JP2012515233 | JP2012515234 | US2012235099 | JP2012198408 | JP2012208494 | JP2012255128 | JP2013029760 | US2013034812 | JP2013043962 | JP2013114249 | WO2013083505 | JP2013522445 | JP2013164471 | JP2013195480 | WO2013167515 | JP2013253145 | JP2014500852 | JP2014130338 | JP2014130173 | JP2014137466 | JP2014533890 | JP2015500562 | WO2015004565 | WO2015036910 | JP2015068893 | WO2015152153 | WO2015166779 | WO2016034963 | WO2016088645 | JP2016532675 | JP6065596B | JP2017019766 | WO2017033680 | WO2017051680 | JP2017523465 | JP2017151342 | JP2017167399 | WO2017164127 | JP2017198865 | JP2017222559 | JP6301489B | JP2018087939 | WO2018230486 | WO2019059359 | WO2019088055 | JP2019078878 | WO2019130772 | JP2020158377 | JP2020180036 |