EP4299951 - MAGNETIC GEARED ROTARY MACHINE, POWER GENERATION SYSTEM, AND MAGNETIC POLE PIECE ROTOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.12.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 10.10.2022 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.08.2024 | Supplementary search report | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsubishi Heavy Industries, Ltd. 2-3, Marunouchi 3-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | For all designated states Magnomatics Limited Park House Bernard Road Sheffield S2 5BQ / GB | [2024/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IKEMI, Takeshi Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 02 /
MATSUSHITA, Takatoshi Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 03 /
SASAKI, Mikito Tokyo 100-8332 / JP | 04 /
CALVERLEY, Stuart Sheffield, South Yorkshire S25BQ / GB | 05 /
POWELL, David Sheffield, South Yorkshire S25BQ / GB | [2024/01] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2024/01] | Application number, filing date | 22780451.5 | 24.03.2022 | [2024/01] | WO2022JP13849 | Priority number, date | JP20210058461 | 30.03.2021 Original published format: JP 2021058461 | [2024/01] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2022210237 | Date: | 06.10.2022 | Language: | JA | [2022/40] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4299951 | Date: | 03.01.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/01] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 06.10.2022 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2024 | Classification | IPC: | F16H49/00, H02K16/02, H02K1/12, H02K49/10, H02K7/11, H02K21/14, // H02K1/14, H02K1/17 | [2024/39] | CPC: |
H02K7/11 (EP);
H02K49/102 (EP,US);
F16H49/005 (EP);
H02K1/12 (EP);
H02K21/14 (EP);
H02K1/14 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2024/01] | F16H49/00, H02K16/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2024/01] | Title | German: | MAGNETISCHE ZAHNRADDREHMASCHINE, STROMERZEUGUNGSSYSTEM UND MAGNETPOLSTÜCKROTOR | [2024/01] | English: | MAGNETIC GEARED ROTARY MACHINE, POWER GENERATION SYSTEM, AND MAGNETIC POLE PIECE ROTOR | [2024/01] | French: | MACHINE ROTATIVE À ENGRENAGE MAGNÉTIQUE, SYSTÈME DE PRODUCTION D'ÉNERGIE ET ROTOR DE PIÈCE POLAIRE MAGNÉTIQUE | [2024/01] | Entry into regional phase | 25.09.2023 | Translation filed | 25.09.2023 | National basic fee paid | 25.09.2023 | Search fee paid | 25.09.2023 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.09.2023 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.09.2023 | Examination requested [2024/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]WO2012114368 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [A]JP2012205348 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP); | [A]JP2016019365 (HITACHI METALS LTD); | [A]US2018269770 (POWELL DAVID JAMES [GB], et al) | by applicant | JP5643857B | JP2021058461 |